Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5915 Week
» 13099 Month
» 321080 Year
» 1205461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1209 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 6209   21/02/1925
LNER (1946) 3556   10/11/1946
LNER (1947) 3761   12/03/1947
BR 63761 w/e 26/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/108/1912
O4/701/06/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19865
To Service During 08/1912 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Thu 18/06/1959 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 46 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 20/6/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 08/1912
ARD Ardsley 11/08/1926
MEX Mexborough 18/01/1928
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 24/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse 06/08/1942
ANN Annesley 07/05/1944
WFD Woodford Halse 29/06/1947
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
CLK Colwick 22/01/1950
38B Annesley 08/10/1950
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
36C Frodingham 13/06/1954
   Withdrawn 18/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse 29/06/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   18/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1475)
28/07/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1476)
07/10/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 768)
13/08/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1448)
24/09/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 940)
19/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1878)
28/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 814)
01/05/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 870)
01/06/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3669)
18/04/1942 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3660)
22/07/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3674)
05/10/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3696)
23/06/1951 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22319)
10/10/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22307)
15/12/1956 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22870)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/06/1917 28/07/1917 57 days General
Boiler number 1476 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1922 07/10/1922 92 days General
Boiler number 768 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1925 21/02/1925 43 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6209
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1927 13/08/1927 78 days General
Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1929 24/09/1929 67 days General
Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1931 19/12/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1878 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1934 28/07/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1937 01/05/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1940 01/06/1940 29 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1942 18/04/1942 17 days General
Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1944 22/07/1944 29 days General
Boiler number 3674 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1946 05/10/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3696 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1949 26/02/1949 22 days General
Renumbered to BR 63761
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1950 17/06/1950 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 09/06/1951 23/06/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22319 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1953 10/10/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22307 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1954 11/09/1954 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 17/11/1956 15/12/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22870 (Diagram 15D)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1209
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19865
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/06/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1917. Dep: 28/07/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1476 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1922. Dep: 07/10/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 768 (Diagram 15)
   
10/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1925. Dep: 21/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6209
   
11/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
28/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1927. Dep: 13/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15)
   
18/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
20/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1929. Dep: 24/09/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15)
   
28/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1931. Dep: 19/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1878 (Diagram 15)
   
21/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1934. Dep: 28/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
   
24/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1937. Dep: 01/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 01/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D)
   
24/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
02/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1942. Dep: 18/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D)
   
06/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
07/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
24/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3674 (Diagram 15D)
   
14/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3696 (Diagram 15D)
   
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3556    
12/03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3761    
29/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
05/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1949. Dep: 26/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63761
   
22/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
27/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/05/1950. Dep: 17/06/1950.    
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
09/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22319 (Diagram 15D)
   
19/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22307 (Diagram 15D)
   
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works. RO 9/1954 Link
04/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/09/1954. Dep: 11/09/1954.    
17/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22870 (Diagram 15D)
   
18/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63761 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev