Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 127 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5936 Week
» 13120 Month
» 321101 Year
» 1205482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1211 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 6211   01/11/1924
LNER (1946) 3558   30/12/1946
LNER (1947) 3772   24/02/1947
BR (Tmp) E3772   13/03/1948
BR 63772 w/e 19/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/108/1912
O4/720/06/1942
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19867
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal w/e Sun 03/03/1963 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 50 yrs, 7 mths , 0 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Colwick after 10/24; by 2/27
Into Doncaster for cutting up 3/12/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STV Staveley (G.C.) 09/10/1915
CLK Colwick m/e 02/1927
WHL West Hartlepool 03/09/1942
HLS Hull Springhead 06/01/1945
HLD Hull Dairycoates 29/04/1946
53E Cudworth 13/05/1951
20C Royston 12/08/1951
38A Colwick 02/09/1951
38D Staveley (G.C.) 27/04/1952
41F Mexborough 31/01/1960
41A Sheffield Darnall 09/12/1962
41H Staveley (G.C.) 13/01/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 03/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 53E Cudworth w/e 19/05/1951
LOAN 20C Royston w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 20C Royston 12/08/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 17/05/1952
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 3w/e 02/02/1963
WDN   03/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1477)
26/05/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1444)
01/11/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1465)
07/05/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1880)
17/09/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1214)
09/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1962)
12/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3294)
02/12/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3296)
20/06/1942 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3685)
22/04/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3680)
09/03/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3686)
13/03/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3671)
21/10/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22304)
25/10/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22321)
29/01/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22337)
06/04/1957 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22311)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 03/02/1917 26/05/1917 113 days General
Boiler number 1444 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1922 25/11/1922 57 days General  
Gorton Works 26/07/1924 01/11/1924 99 days General
Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6211
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1927 07/05/1927 85 days General
Boiler number 1880 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1929 19/10/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 03/09/1932 17/09/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1935 09/03/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1962 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1937 12/06/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1939 02/12/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 30/03/1942 20/06/1942 83 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3685 (Diagram 15D)
 
Darlington Works 27/10/1943 27/10/1943 1 day Weighing  
Gorton Works 06/04/1944 22/04/1944 17 days General
Boiler number 3680 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1946 09/03/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3686 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1948 13/03/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3772
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1949 19/11/1949 22 days Heavy Casual
Renumbered to BR 63772
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1950 21/10/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 22304 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1952 25/10/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 3695 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 25/12/1954 29/01/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 22337 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1955 03/12/1955 17 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 06/12/1955 12/12/1955 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 16/03/1957 06/04/1957 22 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22311 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1960 23/04/1960 36 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1211
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19867
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/10/1915 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
03/02/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1917. Dep: 26/05/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1444 (Diagram 15)
   
30/09/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1922. Dep: 25/11/1922.    
26/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1924. Dep: 01/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6211
   
02/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1927. Dep: 07/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1880 (Diagram 15)
   
21/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1929. Dep: 19/10/1929.    
03/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1932. Dep: 17/09/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 15)
   
23/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1935. Dep: 09/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1962 (Diagram 15)
   
05/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15)
   
25/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1939. Dep: 02/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15)
   
30/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1942. Dep: 20/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3685 (Diagram 15D)
   
03/09/1942 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
27/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 27/10/1943. Dep: 27/10/1943.    
06/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3680 (Diagram 15D)
   
06/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
23/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3686 (Diagram 15D)
   
29/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
30/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3558    
24/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3772    
21/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1948. Dep: 13/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3772
   
29/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/10/1949. Dep: 19/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63772
   
07/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1950. Dep: 21/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22304 (Diagram 15D)
   
13/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (53E)    
12/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
27/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
11/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1952. Dep: 25/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3695 (Diagram 15D)
   
25/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1954. Dep: 29/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22337 (Diagram 15D)
   
17/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955.    
06/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1955. Dep: 12/12/1955.    
16/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/03/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22311 (Diagram 15D)
   
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
19/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/03/1960. Dep: 23/04/1960.    
09/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
13/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
03/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63772 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev