Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 132 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4263 Week
» 14433 Month
» 292229 Year
» 1176610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1212 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 6212   15/08/1925
War Dept. 719   16/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19868
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Wed 10/09/1941 off Annesley (ANN)
Service Life 29 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 719 and sent to Middle East via Birkenhead 16/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 14/09/1912
   Withdrawn 10/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1478)
02/03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1471)
27/10/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1953)
25/02/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1859)
08/03/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1326)
14/05/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1862)
15/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1151)
13/03/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 818)
29/04/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3367)
02/08/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 821)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 01/12/1917 02/03/1918 92 days General
Boiler number 1471 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1920 27/11/1920 64 days General  
Gorton Works 07/07/1923 27/10/1923 113 days General
Boiler number 1953 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1925 15/08/1925 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6212
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1928 25/02/1928 43 days General
Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1930 08/03/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1326 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1932 14/05/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1862 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1934 15/12/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1151 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1935 02/11/1935 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 27/02/1937 13/03/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/04/1939 29/04/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1941 02/08/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1212
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19868
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
14/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
01/12/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1917. Dep: 02/03/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1471 (Diagram 15)
   
25/09/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1920. Dep: 27/11/1920.    
07/07/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1923. Dep: 27/10/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1953 (Diagram 15)
   
16/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1925. Dep: 15/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6212
   
14/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1928. Dep: 25/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15)
   
15/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1326 (Diagram 15)
   
30/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1932. Dep: 14/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1862 (Diagram 15)
   
01/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1934. Dep: 15/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1151 (Diagram 15)
   
19/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1935. Dep: 02/11/1935.    
27/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15)
   
15/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1939. Dep: 29/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 15)
   
19/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1941. Dep: 02/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15)
   
10/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 6212 from Annesley (ANN)    
16/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 719    

prev prev