Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 655 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4786 Week
» 14956 Month
» 292752 Year
» 1177133 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1213 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 6213   18/04/1925
LNER (1946) 3560   18/11/1946
LNER (1947) 3773   06/03/1947
BR 63773 w/e 17/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/108/1912
O106/04/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19869
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Sun 18/10/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 52 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Killamarsh, 12/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 16/09/1912
STV Staveley (G.C.) 30/09/1944
FRO Frodingham 14/04/1946
GOR Gorton 12/05/1946
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
HSY Hornsey 02/07/1948
GOR Gorton 05/09/1948
38B Annesley 26/11/1950
31B March 24/02/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 29/11/1959
   Withdrawn 18/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC HSY Hornsey w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 11/09/1948
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   18/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1479)
27/04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1516)
18/04/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1189)
22/03/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1335)
05/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1180)
23/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1030)
09/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1218)
30/04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3329)
27/04/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3394)
21/02/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3272)
29/04/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 828)
06/04/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5053)
17/04/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5042)
07/04/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28303)
17/01/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28390)
16/10/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28853)
11/08/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28899)
13/12/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28831)
07/10/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28944)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/12/1917 27/04/1918 127 days General
Boiler number 1516 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1922 11/11/1922 43 days General  
Gorton Works 07/03/1925 18/04/1925 43 days General
Boiler number 1189 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6213
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1927 19/11/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 01/03/1930 22/03/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1335 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1931 05/12/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1180 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1934 23/06/1934 22 days General
Wakefield 2C Lubricator fitted
Boiler number 1030 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1936 09/05/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1938 30/04/1938 15 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1940 27/04/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1942 21/02/1942 17 days General
Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1944 29/04/1944 31 days General
Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1946 06/04/1946 85 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5053 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1948 17/04/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 5042 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63773
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1949 05/03/1949 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 26/11/1949 26/11/1949 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 11/02/1950 11/02/1950 1 day Light Casual  
Gorton Works 10/03/1951 07/04/1951 29 days General
Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 27/12/1952 17/01/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1954 16/10/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 28853 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1955 17/09/1955 36 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 30/06/1956 11/08/1956 43 days General
Boiler number 28899 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1958 13/12/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 28831 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1961 07/10/1961 43 days General
Boiler number 28944 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1213
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19869
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
22/12/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1917. Dep: 27/04/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1516 (Diagram 15)
   
30/09/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1922. Dep: 11/11/1922.    
07/03/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1925. Dep: 18/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1189 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6213
   
08/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1927. Dep: 19/11/1927.    
01/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1930. Dep: 22/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1335 (Diagram 15)
   
14/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1180 (Diagram 15)
   
02/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Wakefield 2C Lubricator fitted
Boiler number 1030 (Diagram 15)
   
25/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15)
   
16/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1938. Dep: 30/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15)
   
20/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1942. Dep: 21/02/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15)
   
30/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15)
   
30/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
12/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5053 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3560    
06/03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3773    
20/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1948. Dep: 17/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5042 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63773
   
02/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY)    
05/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/03/1949. Dep: 05/03/1949.    
26/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/11/1949. Dep: 26/11/1949.    
11/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/02/1950. Dep: 11/02/1950.    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
10/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1951. Dep: 07/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1952. Dep: 17/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1954. Dep: 16/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28853 (Diagram 100A)
   
13/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/08/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955.    
30/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28899 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
15/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1958. Dep: 13/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28831 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
26/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1961. Dep: 07/10/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28944 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63773 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev