Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 177 Today
» 977 Yesterday
» 4173 Week
» 11357 Month
» 319338 Year
» 1203719 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1214 m/e 09/1912
LNER (1924) 6214   04/09/1926
LNER (1946) 3561   29/11/1946
LNER (1947) 3777   27/03/1947
BR 63777 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/109/1912
O102/11/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19870
To Service During 09/1912
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/10/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 50 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 23/09/1912
CLK Colwick 13/10/1940
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
GOR Gorton 25/06/1945
DON Doncaster 09/09/1945
GOR Gorton 03/11/1946
38B Annesley 20/10/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 27/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 09/11/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 28/10/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 27/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1480)
15/12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1468)
03/11/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1144)
04/09/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1536)
22/11/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1958)
01/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1097)
21/09/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3208)
14/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1870)
11/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1297)
10/01/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3284)
22/04/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1006)
02/11/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5086)
30/04/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5005)
11/08/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28813)
05/09/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28809)
20/08/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28132)
13/07/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28275)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 25/08/1917 15/12/1917 113 days General
Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1920 18/12/1920 71 days General  
Gorton Works 15/09/1923 03/11/1923 50 days General
Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1926 04/09/1926 92 days General
Boiler number 1536 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6214
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1928 25/08/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 01/11/1930 22/11/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1958 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1933 01/07/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1097 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1935 21/09/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1937 14/08/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1939 11/11/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1941 10/01/1942 18 days General
Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1944 22/04/1944 11 days General
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1946 02/11/1946 99 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5086 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1947 15/10/1947 25 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 04/04/1949 30/04/1949 27 days General
Boiler number 5005 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63777
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1951 11/08/1951 49 days General
Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1951 28/08/1951 15 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 31/07/1953 05/09/1953 37 days General
Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1954 02/10/1954 23 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 06/07/1955 20/08/1955 46 days General
Boiler number 28132 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1955 03/12/1955 6 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 30/11/1956 15/12/1956 16 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/06/1957 13/07/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1960 17/11/1960 43 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1214
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19870
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
23/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
25/08/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1917. Dep: 15/12/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15)
   
09/10/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1920. Dep: 18/12/1920.    
15/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1923. Dep: 03/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
   
05/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1926. Dep: 04/09/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1536 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6214
   
14/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1928. Dep: 25/08/1928.    
01/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1958 (Diagram 15)
   
24/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1933. Dep: 01/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1097 (Diagram 15)
   
14/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1935. Dep: 21/09/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15)
   
31/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1937. Dep: 14/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15)
   
28/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 11/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
24/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1941. Dep: 10/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5086 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/11/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3561    
27/03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3777    
21/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1947. Dep: 15/10/1947.    
04/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1949. Dep: 30/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5005 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63777
   
20/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
24/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/08/1951. Dep: 28/08/1951.    
31/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A)
   
10/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/09/1954. Dep: 02/10/1954.    
06/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1955. Dep: 20/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28132 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/11/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955.    
30/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956.    
15/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1957. Dep: 13/07/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/10/1960. Dep: 17/11/1960.    
27/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63777 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev