Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 115 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1040 Week
» 18376 Month
» 296172 Year
» 1180553 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1215 m/e 09/1912
LNER (1924) 6215   02/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3562   16/12/1946
LNER (1947) 3778   04/02/1947
BR 63778 w/e 06/08/1949
War Dept. 042   22/02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19871
To Service During 09/1912
Withdrawal Fri 22/02/1952 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 39 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 042 and sold to WD 22/2/52. Sent to Egypt to replace Stanier 8F

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 23/09/1912
IMM Immingham 04/06/1929
KEA Keadby 23/07/1931
FRO Frodingham 12/06/1932
   Withdrawn 22/02/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1481)
30/09/1916 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1527)
04/06/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1883)
04/06/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1881)
28/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1494)
06/05/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1150)
30/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 946)
26/03/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 927)
29/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1267)
20/02/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3318)
28/07/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3225)
21/12/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1245)
06/08/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3274)
23/02/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22243)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/08/1916 30/09/1916 50 days General
Boiler number 1527 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1921 04/06/1921 36 days General
Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1923 02/02/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6215
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1926 22/01/1927 71 days General  
Gorton Works 09/03/1929 01/06/1929 85 days General  
Gorton Works 14/03/1931 28/03/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1933 06/05/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1150 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1935 30/11/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1938 26/03/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1940 29/06/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1943 20/02/1943 11 days General
Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1945 28/07/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1946 21/12/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3562
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1949 06/08/1949 36 days General
Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63778
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1952 23/02/1952 22 days General
Converted to oil fuel
Boiler number 22243 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 042
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1215
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19871
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
23/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
12/08/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1916. Dep: 30/09/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1527 (Diagram 15)
   
30/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1921. Dep: 04/06/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1923. Dep: 02/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6215
   
13/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1926. Dep: 22/01/1927.    
09/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1929. Dep: 01/06/1929.    
04/06/1929 Modification Diagram 15 number 1881 boiler fitted    
04/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
14/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15)
   
23/07/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
12/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
22/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1150 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1935. Dep: 30/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15)
   
12/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1938. Dep: 26/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15)
   
15/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 15)
   
10/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15)
   
23/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3562
   
04/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3778    
02/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63778
   
02/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Converted to oil fuel
Boiler number 22243 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 042
   
22/02/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 042 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev