Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 730 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3873 Week
» 14043 Month
» 291839 Year
» 1176220 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1216 m/e 09/1912
LNER (1924) 6216   15/08/1925
LNER (1946) 3563   02/12/1946
LNER (1947) 3789   28/02/1947
BR 63789 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/109/1912
O119/01/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19872
To Service During 09/1912
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 50 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 6/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 25/09/1912
MEX Mexborough 20/09/1919
GOR Gorton 27/01/1946
HSY Hornsey 02/07/1948
GOR Gorton 22/08/1948
38B Annesley 26/11/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HSY Hornsey w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 28/08/1948
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1482)
05/07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1487)
15/08/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1026)
12/07/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1490)
14/01/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1306)
04/01/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1236)
04/01/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
11/02/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1187)
14/03/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3394)
12/06/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3406)
19/01/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5033)
04/1946 Drop Grate fitted
03/05/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5048)
12/03/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28298)
02/05/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28379)
27/05/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28275)
22/06/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28380)
01/07/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28939)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 25/01/1919 05/07/1919 162 days General
Boiler number 1487 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1921 14/05/1921 50 days General  
Gorton Works 09/06/1923 18/08/1923 71 days General  
Gorton Works 02/05/1925 15/08/1925 106 days General
Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6216
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1928 28/07/1928 36 days General  
Gorton Works 21/06/1930 12/07/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1490 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1932 14/01/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1306 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1935 04/01/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1939 11/02/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1942 14/03/1942 13 days General
Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1942 12/06/1942 12 days General  
Gorton Works 03/11/1945 19/01/1946 78 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
 
Gorton Works 1946 04/1946   Light Repair
Boiler number 5033 (Diagram 100A)
Drop Grate fitted
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1948 03/05/1948 51 days General
Boiler number 5048 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63789
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1948 01/07/1948 11 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 06/02/1951 12/03/1951 35 days General
Boiler number 28298 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1952 02/05/1952 34 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28379 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 23/04/1953 16/05/1953 24 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 02/09/1954 16/10/1954 45 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 21/04/1955 27/05/1955 37 days General
Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1957 22/06/1957 34 days General
Boiler number 28380 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1959 10/07/1959 25 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 30/11/1960 28/12/1960 29 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 19/05/1961 01/07/1961 44 days General
Boiler number 28939 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1216
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19872
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
25/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
25/01/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1919. Dep: 05/07/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1487 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
26/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1921. Dep: 14/05/1921.    
09/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1923. Dep: 18/08/1923.    
02/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1925. Dep: 15/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6216
   
23/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 28/07/1928.    
21/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1930. Dep: 12/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1490 (Diagram 15)
   
31/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1932. Dep: 14/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1306 (Diagram 15)
   
21/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1935. Dep: 04/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
21/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1939. Dep: 11/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15)
   
02/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1942. Dep: 14/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15)
   
01/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1942. Dep: 12/06/1942.    
12/06/1943 Modification Diagram 15 number 3406 boiler fitted    
03/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1945. Dep: 19/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
   
1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5033 (Diagram 100A)
Drop Grate fitted
   
27/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3563    
28/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3789    
14/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1948. Dep: 03/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5048 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63789
   
21/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1948. Dep: 01/07/1948.    
02/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY)    
22/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
06/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1951. Dep: 12/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28298 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/03/1952. Dep: 02/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28379 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/04/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953.    
02/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/09/1954. Dep: 16/10/1954.    
21/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1955. Dep: 27/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1957. Dep: 22/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28380 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/06/1959. Dep: 10/07/1959.    
30/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/11/1960. Dep: 28/12/1960.    
19/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1961. Dep: 01/07/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28939 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63789 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev