Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 576 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3719 Week
» 13889 Month
» 291685 Year
» 1176066 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1218 m/e 09/1912
LNER (1924) 6218   25/09/1926
LNER (1946) 3565   19/11/1946
LNER (1947) 3797   07/03/1947
BR 63797 w/e 07/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19874
To Service During 09/1912
Withdrawal Fri 27/02/1959 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 46 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 29/09/1912
CLK Colwick 16/02/1934
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 12/03/1944
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley 06/06/1948
SHF Sheffield Darnall 16/01/1949
   Withdrawn 27/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 12/06/1948
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 22/01/1949
WDN   27/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1484)
27/04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1540)
24/11/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1500)
25/09/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 518)
02/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1432)
13/01/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 932)
13/06/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1086)
15/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1050)
09/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1039)
10/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1188)
02/06/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3212)
11/10/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3228)
07/01/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3304)
25/10/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22153)
02/07/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22884)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 15/12/1917 27/04/1918 134 days General
Boiler number 1540 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1920 11/12/1920 43 days General  
Gorton Works 22/09/1923 24/11/1923 64 days General
Boiler number 1500 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1926 25/09/1926 78 days General
Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6218
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1928 17/11/1928 85 days General  
Gorton Works 11/04/1931 02/05/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1432 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1933 13/01/1934 15 days General
Wakefield 2C Lubricator fitted
Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1936 13/06/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 1086 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1938 15/10/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 1050 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1940 09/11/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1943 10/04/1943 10 days General
Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1944 01/04/1944 13 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 05/05/1945 02/06/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/09/1947 11/10/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1949 07/01/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 3304 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63797
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1952 25/10/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22153 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1955 02/07/1955 43 days General
Boiler number 22884 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1959 28/02/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1218
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19874
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
29/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
15/12/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1917. Dep: 27/04/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1540 (Diagram 15)
   
30/10/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1920. Dep: 11/12/1920.    
22/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1923. Dep: 24/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1500 (Diagram 15)
   
10/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1926. Dep: 25/09/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6218
   
25/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1928. Dep: 17/11/1928.    
11/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1432 (Diagram 15)
   
30/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1933. Dep: 13/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Wakefield 2C Lubricator fitted
Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15)
   
16/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1086 (Diagram 15)
   
17/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1050 (Diagram 15)
   
02/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1940. Dep: 09/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15)
   
01/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
20/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/03/1944. Dep: 01/04/1944.    
05/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
19/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3565    
07/03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3797    
20/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1947. Dep: 11/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15)
   
06/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
16/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
17/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1949. Dep: 07/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3304 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63797
   
04/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1952. Dep: 25/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22153 (Diagram 15)
   
21/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22884 (Diagram 15)
   
27/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63797 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
28/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 28/02/1959. Dep: 28/02/1959.    

prev prev