Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 1197 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 1197 Week
» 3779 Month
» 268412 Year
» 1489977 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1220 m/e 10/1912
LNER (1924) 6220   28/05/1925
LNER (1946) 3567   28/11/1946
LNER (1947) 3803 on 17/03/1947
BR 63803 w/e 15/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/110/1912
O109/06/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19876
To Service During 10/1912
Withdrawal w/e Sun 17/03/1963 off March (31B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 50 yrs, 5 mths , 15 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes The repair dates between 1920 and 1942 have been deduced from Tender Shop records.

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1912
ANN Annesley m/e 11/1912
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 24/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse 03/02/1943
DFU Dunfermline Upper 10/02/1943
IMM Immingham 14/07/1943
LNG Langwith Junction 09/01/1944
GOR Gorton 17/06/1945
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 16/07/1950
31B March 17/02/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 17/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 16/07/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   17/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1486)
15/07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1749)
28/05/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1389)
09/11/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1247)
18/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1073)
11/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1934)
12/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1951)
12/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1950)
08/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3226)
10/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3344)
09/06/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5037)
13/06/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5039)
15/10/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5026)
15/03/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28374)
24/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28289)
22/10/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28298)
07/12/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28805)
02/06/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28946)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/06/1918 15/07/1918 34 days General
Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/09/1920 22/09/1920 12 days Unknown Regime  
Gorton Works 05/01/1923 31/01/1923 27 days Unknown Regime  
Gorton Works 14/05/1925 28/05/1925 15 days General
Boiler number 1389 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6220
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1927 29/10/1927 15 days Unknown Regime  
Gorton Works 02/11/1929 09/11/1929 8 days General
Boiler number 1247 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1932 18/06/1932 11 days General
Boiler number 1073 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1934 11/12/1934 9 days General
Boiler number 1934 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1936 12/08/1936 3 days General
Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1938 12/10/1938 12 days General
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 1940 08/1940   General
Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1942 10/10/1942 96 days General
Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1945 09/06/1945 78 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5037 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1947 13/06/1947 28 days General
Boiler number 28307 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1948 24/01/1948 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 19/09/1948 15/10/1948 27 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 25/08/1949 15/10/1949 52 days General
Boiler number 5026 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63803
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1952 15/03/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 28374 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1953 24/10/1953 24 days General
Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 04/12/1954 24/12/1954 21 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 24/09/1955 22/10/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 28298 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1957 07/12/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1958 29/11/1958 18 days Heavy
After collision
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1959 03/03/1959 20 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 19/04/1961 02/06/1961 45 days General
Boiler number 28946 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 22/02/1963 22/02/1963 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1220
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19876
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
11/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
12/06/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1918. Dep: 15/07/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15)
   
11/09/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 11/09/1920. Dep: 22/09/1920.    
05/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 05/01/1923. Dep: 31/01/1923.    
14/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1925. Dep: 28/05/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1389 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6220
   
15/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927.    
02/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1247 (Diagram 15)
   
08/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1932. Dep: 18/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1073 (Diagram 15)
   
03/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1934. Dep: 11/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1934 (Diagram 15)
   
10/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1936. Dep: 12/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15)
   
01/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1938. Dep: 12/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
   
1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1940. Dep: 00/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
07/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15)
   
03/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
10/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
14/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
09/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
24/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5037 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3567    
17/03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3803    
17/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1947. Dep: 13/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28307 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1948. Dep: 24/01/1948.    
19/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/09/1948. Dep: 15/10/1948.    
25/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1949. Dep: 15/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5026 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63803
   
16/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
01/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1952. Dep: 15/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28374 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1953. Dep: 24/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/12/1954. Dep: 24/12/1954.    
24/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28298 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/11/1958. Dep: 29/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
12/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/02/1959. Dep: 03/03/1959.    
19/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1961. Dep: 02/06/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28946 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/02/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/02/1963. Dep: 22/02/1963.    
17/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63803 from March (31B)    

prev prev