|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 18/05/1918 | 26/10/1918 | 162 days | General | Boiler number 1512 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1921 | 12/02/1921 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1923 | 15/09/1923 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1925 | 06/02/1926 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1487 (Diagram 15A) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6221 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1928 | 12/05/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1930 | 11/10/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1057 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1933 | 18/03/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1935 | 16/03/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/01/1937 | 30/01/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1938 | 24/12/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1868 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1940 | 30/11/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3333 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Stratford Works | 24/03/1943 | 28/04/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1945 | 25/08/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3432 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/09/1947 | 04/10/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1949 | 26/11/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15A) Renumbered to BR 63805 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1952 | 29/03/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22255 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1954 | 19/06/1954 | 64 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28376 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1954 | 29/10/1954 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1957 | 26/01/1957 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28326 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1958 | 05/07/1958 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1960 | 12/11/1960 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/1960 | Gorton MPD | Ex-Works on Gorton (9G) Shed: 63617, 63744, 63805, 64354, 90111. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1221 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19877 Diagram 15A boiler fitted |
||
11/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
18/05/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1918. Dep: 26/10/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1512 (Diagram 15A) |
||
08/01/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1921. Dep: 12/02/1921. | ||
23/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1923. Dep: 15/09/1923. | ||
28/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1925. Dep: 06/02/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1487 (Diagram 15A) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6221 |
||
31/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1928. Dep: 12/05/1928. | ||
06/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1930. Dep: 11/10/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1057 (Diagram 15A) |
||
04/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1933. Dep: 18/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15A) |
||
09/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1935. Dep: 16/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15A) |
||
16/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1937. Dep: 30/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15A) |
||
10/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1938. Dep: 24/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1868 (Diagram 15A) |
||
23/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3333 (Diagram 15A) |
||
24/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1943. Dep: 28/04/1943. | ||
04/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3432 (Diagram 15A) |
||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3568 | ||
09/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3805 | ||
13/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1947. Dep: 04/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15A) |
||
19/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
13/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
05/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
11/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
05/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1949. Dep: 26/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15A) Renumbered to BR 63805 |
||
05/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
15/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1952. Dep: 29/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22255 (Diagram 15A) |
||
17/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1954. Dep: 19/06/1954. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28376 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1954. Dep: 29/10/1954. | ||
05/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1957. Dep: 26/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28326 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1958. Dep: 05/07/1958. | ||
08/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/10/1960. Dep: 12/11/1960. | ||
03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63805 from Gorton (9G) |