Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 624 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3310 Week
» 4200 Month
» 312181 Year
» 1196562 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1222 m/e 10/1912
LNER (1924) 6222   25/07/1925
LNER (1946) 3569   17/11/1946
LNER (1947) 3809   09/02/1947
BR 63809 w/e 30/07/1949
War Dept. 040   22/02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19878
To Service During 10/1912
Withdrawal Fri 22/02/1952 off Langwith Junction (40E)
Service Life 39 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 04O and sold to the WD 22/2/52. Sent to Egypt to replace a Stanier 8F

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 20/09/1919
CLK Colwick 28/01/1945
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
GOR Gorton 20/02/1948
ANN Annesley 07/03/1948
LNG Langwith Junction 31/01/1949
   Withdrawn 22/02/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 13/03/1948
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 05/02/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1912 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 1488)
07/12/1918 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 1436)
20/08/1921 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 1936)
12/11/1927 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 1865)
16/07/1932 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 1164)
14/03/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
14/03/1936 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 1232)
04/03/1939 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3269)
25/04/1942 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3285)
01/07/1944 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 865)
28/06/1947 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3382)
30/07/1949 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3245)
16/02/1952 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 22241)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 13/07/1918 07/12/1918 148 days General
Boiler number 1436 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1921 20/08/1921 43 days General
Boiler number 1936 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1923 16/06/1923 85 days General  
Gorton Works 16/05/1925 25/07/1925 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6222
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1927 12/11/1927 43 days General
Boiler number 1865 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1929 11/01/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 02/07/1932 16/07/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1164 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 29/02/1936 14/03/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15A)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1939 04/03/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 11/04/1942 25/04/1942 15 days General
Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1944 01/07/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1947 28/06/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3382 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1949 30/07/1949 29 days General
Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 15A)
Renumbered to BR 63809
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1952 16/02/1952 29 days General
Converted to oil fuel
Boiler number 22241 (Diagram 15A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1222
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19878
Diagram 15A boiler fitted
   
13/07/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1918. Dep: 07/12/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1436 (Diagram 15A)
   
20/09/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
09/07/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1921. Dep: 20/08/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1936 (Diagram 15A)
   
24/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1923. Dep: 16/06/1923.    
16/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1925. Dep: 25/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6222
   
01/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1927. Dep: 12/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1865 (Diagram 15A)
   
14/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1929. Dep: 11/01/1930.    
02/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1932. Dep: 16/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1164 (Diagram 15A)
   
29/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15A)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
18/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1939. Dep: 04/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15A)
   
11/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1942. Dep: 25/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 15A)
   
17/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15A)
   
28/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3569    
09/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3809    
07/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3382 (Diagram 15A)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
20/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
31/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
02/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1949. Dep: 30/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 15A)
Renumbered to BR 63809
   
19/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1952. Dep: 16/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Converted to oil fuel
Boiler number 22241 (Diagram 15A)
   
22/02/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 040 from Langwith Junction (40E)    
22/02/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 040    

prev prev