Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1317 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 5277 Week
» 34863 Month
» 408876 Year
» 1630441 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1224 m/e 10/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6224   19/09/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3571   01/12/1946
British Railways 63571 w/e 07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/110/1912
O127/08/1949
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19880
To Service During 10/1912 to Annesley (ANN)
Withdrawal Sun 13/12/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 52 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull, 2/65. Cut up 29/3/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley (New) m/e 10/1912
MEX Mexborough on 20/09/1919
CLK Colwick on 19/09/1944
ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
31B March on 03/03/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) on 03/01/1960
   Withdrawn on 13/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   on 13/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1490)
09/08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1496)
15/10/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1465)
15/12/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1468)
19/09/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1939)
29/03/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1089)
03/09/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1118)
27/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 927)
12/03/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
12/03/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3219)
24/05/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1023)
27/11/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3366)
18/01/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3314)
07/08/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3281)
27/08/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5119)
13/10/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28353)
12/09/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28303)
03/09/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28883)
14/09/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28286)
07/03/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28463)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/04/1919 09/08/1919 120 days General
Boiler number 1496 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1921 15/10/1921 43 days General
Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1923 15/12/1923 57 days General
Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1925 19/09/1925 99 days General
Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6224
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1927 28/01/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 22/02/1930 29/03/1930 36 days General
Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1932 03/09/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1935 27/07/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1938 12/03/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1941 24/05/1941 22 days General
Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1942 05/09/1942 6 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 03/11/1943 27/11/1943 25 days General
Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1946 30/03/1946 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 21/12/1946 18/01/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3314 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1948 07/08/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1949 27/08/1949 113 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5119 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63571
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1951 13/10/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 28353 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1952 18/10/1952 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 29/08/1953 12/09/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1954 23/10/1954 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 30/07/1955 03/09/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 28883 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1957 14/09/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 09/01/1962 07/03/1962 58 days General
Boiler number 28463 (Diagram 100A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/01/1962 Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. SLS/196202
28/01/1962 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. SLS/196203
26/02/1962 Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1224
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19880
Allocated to Annesley (ANN)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
20/09/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
19/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
01/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3571    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
03/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
13/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63571 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev