Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 348 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3896 Week
» 4786 Month
» 312767 Year
» 1197148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1226 m/e 11/1912
LNER (1924) 6226   26/09/1925
LNER (1946) 3573   29/12/1946
BR 63573   04/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/111/1912
O4/809/04/1955
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19882
To Service During 11/1912 to Annesley (ANN)
Withdrawal Thu 27/04/1961 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 48 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley (New) m/e 11/1912
FRO Frodingham 12/02/1939
CLK Colwick 22/12/1944
ANN Annesley 18/04/1948
CLK Colwick 26/12/1948
38B Annesley 17/09/1950
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
   Withdrawn 27/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 24/04/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 01/01/1949
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 29/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1492)
03/07/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1859)
18/02/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1028)
15/02/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1389)
02/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1143)
01/09/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1153)
27/06/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1175)
13/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3246)
23/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 487)
27/02/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1239)
04/08/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3221)
15/12/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3415)
08/11/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3297)
04/02/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3325)
06/09/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22293)
09/04/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28288)
11/01/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28944)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 29/05/1920 03/07/1920 36 days General
Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1922 17/02/1923 78 days General  
Gorton Works 27/06/1925 26/09/1925 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6226
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1928 18/02/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 1028 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1930 15/02/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1389 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1932 02/07/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1143 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1934 01/09/1934 15 days General
Wakefield 2C Lubricator fitted
Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1936 27/06/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1175 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1938 13/08/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1940 23/11/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1943 27/02/1943 16 days General
Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1945 04/08/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1945 15/12/1945 8 days Heavy
Boiler number 3415 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1947 08/11/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1950 04/02/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63573
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1952 06/09/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 22293 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1955 09/04/1955 57 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28288 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1957 11/01/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 28944 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1961 22/04/1961 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1226
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19882
Allocated to Annesley (ANN)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
29/05/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1920. Dep: 03/07/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1922. Dep: 17/02/1923.    
27/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1925. Dep: 26/09/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6226
   
14/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1928. Dep: 18/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1028 (Diagram 15)
   
25/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 15/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1389 (Diagram 15)
   
18/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1932. Dep: 02/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1143 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1934. Dep: 01/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Wakefield 2C Lubricator fitted
Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
   
13/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 27/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1175 (Diagram 15)
   
06/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1938. Dep: 13/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 15)
   
12/02/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
16/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15)
   
12/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15)
   
08/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/12/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3415 (Diagram 15)
   
29/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3573    
11/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1947. Dep: 08/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15)
   
18/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
26/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1950. Dep: 04/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63573
   
17/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
23/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1952. Dep: 06/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22293 (Diagram 15)
   
12/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1955. Dep: 09/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28288 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28944 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/04/1961. Dep: 22/04/1961.    
27/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63573 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev