Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 140 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1180 Week
» 11350 Month
» 289146 Year
» 1173527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1227 m/e 11/1912
LNER (1924) 6227   02/05/1925
LNER (1946) 3574   22/12/1946
BR 63574 w/e 21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19883
To Service During 11/1912 to Annesley (ANN)
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
Service Life 49 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 2/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley (New) m/e 11/1912
MAR March 09/03/1929
MEX Mexborough 01/04/1932
CLK Colwick 19/09/1944
SHF Sheffield Darnall 07/08/1949
   Withdrawn 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 13/08/1949
WDN   23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1493)
24/08/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1857)
08/10/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1519)
12/07/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1290)
02/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1068)
09/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1117)
22/01/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3228)
04/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3259)
10/01/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1136)
08/01/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1016)
06/04/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3229)
21/08/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1129)
18/08/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22209)
03/04/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22230)
11/05/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22125)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Beyer Peacock Ltd. 20/02/1920 24/08/1920 187 days General
Boiler number 1857 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1922 03/03/1923 71 days General  
Gorton Works 28/02/1925 02/05/1925 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6227
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1927 08/10/1927 57 days General
Boiler number 1519 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1928 01/12/1928 71 days General  
Gorton Works 21/06/1930 12/07/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1290 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1932 02/04/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1935 09/03/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1117 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1938 22/01/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1940 04/01/1941 22 days General
Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1941 10/01/1942 13 days Heavy
Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1943 08/01/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1946 06/04/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1948 21/08/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63574
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1951 18/08/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22209 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1954 03/04/1954 22 days General
Boiler number 22230 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1957 11/05/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 22125 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1227
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19883
Allocated to Annesley (ANN)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
20/02/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Beyer Peacock Ltd. (General) - Arr: 20/02/1920. Dep: 24/08/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1857 (Diagram 15)
   
23/12/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1922. Dep: 03/03/1923.    
28/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 02/05/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6227
   
13/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1519 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1928. Dep: 01/12/1928.    
09/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
21/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1930. Dep: 12/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1290 (Diagram 15)
   
19/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1932. Dep: 02/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15)
   
01/04/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1935. Dep: 09/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1117 (Diagram 15)
   
08/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1938. Dep: 22/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15)
   
14/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1940. Dep: 04/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15)
   
29/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/12/1941. Dep: 10/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15)
   
18/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1943. Dep: 08/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15)
   
19/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
16/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3574    
24/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63574
   
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
04/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1951. Dep: 18/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22209 (Diagram 15)
   
13/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1954. Dep: 03/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22230 (Diagram 15)
   
13/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1957. Dep: 11/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22125 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63574 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev