Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 147 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 4585 Month
» 312566 Year
» 1196947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1228 m/e 11/1912
LNER (1924) 6228   02/10/1926
LNER (1946) 3575   01/12/1946
BR (Tmp) E3575   14/02/1948
BR 63575 w/e 30/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/111/1912
O4/802/09/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19884
To Service During 11/1912
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/11/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 50 yrs , 3 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 12/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 03/11/1912
CLK Colwick 23/01/1949
38B Annesley 05/02/1950
39A Gorton 16/07/1950
40B Immingham 18/07/1952
39A Gorton 20/09/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 03/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 16/07/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 03/10/1953
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 03/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1494)
12/02/1921 Ross Pop safety valves fitted
12/02/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1873)
02/02/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1957)
23/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1873)
02/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1041)
18/01/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3228)
18/01/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
08/01/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 813)
20/01/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 858)
04/04/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3214)
02/09/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5017)
27/09/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5041)
03/12/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5038)
29/12/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28368)
13/03/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28811)
29/09/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28849)
21/05/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28392)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 15/01/1921 12/02/1921 29 days General
Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1923 19/01/1924 71 days General  
Gorton Works 12/06/1926 02/10/1926 113 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6228
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1928 02/02/1929 92 days General
Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1931 23/05/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1933 02/12/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1935 18/01/1936 19 days General
Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 25/12/1937 08/01/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1940 20/01/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1942 04/04/1942 16 days General
Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1944 02/09/1944 36 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5017 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/09/1947 27/09/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 5041 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1948 14/02/1948 34 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3575
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1948 30/10/1948 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63575
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1949 11/06/1949 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 19/11/1949 03/12/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 5038 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1951 29/12/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 28368 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1952 22/11/1952 22 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 20/02/1954 13/03/1954 22 days General
Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1956 29/09/1956 22 days General
Boiler number 28849 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1957 21/12/1957 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 09/04/1960 21/05/1960 43 days General
Boiler number 28392 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1960 04/06/1960 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 11/06/1960 18/06/1960 8 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1228
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19884
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
03/11/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
15/01/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1921. Dep: 12/02/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
   
10/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1923. Dep: 19/01/1924.    
12/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1926. Dep: 02/10/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6228
   
03/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1928. Dep: 02/02/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15)
   
02/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 23/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15)
   
18/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1933. Dep: 02/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15)
   
31/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
25/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1937. Dep: 08/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
   
06/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1940. Dep: 20/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15)
   
20/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1942. Dep: 04/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15)
   
29/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5017 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3575    
06/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5041 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/01/1948. Dep: 14/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3575
   
23/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/10/1948. Dep: 30/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63575
   
23/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
04/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/06/1949. Dep: 11/06/1949.    
19/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5038 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
16/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
08/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1951. Dep: 29/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28368 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 01/11/1952. Dep: 22/11/1952.    
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
20/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1956. Dep: 29/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28849 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/12/1957. Dep: 21/12/1957.    
09/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1960. Dep: 21/05/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28392 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1960. Dep: 04/06/1960.    
11/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1960. Dep: 18/06/1960.    
03/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63575 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev