Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 732 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3875 Week
» 14045 Month
» 291841 Year
» 1176222 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1230 m/e 11/1912
LNER (1924) 6230   27/03/1926
War Dept. 772   18/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19886
To Service During 11/1912 to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Withdrawal Sat 18/10/1941 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 772 and sent to Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STV Staveley (G.C.) (New) m/e 11/1912
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 23/01/1934
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 04/11/1935
   Withdrawn 18/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1496)
05/10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1478)
30/06/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1433)
27/03/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1126)
29/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1295)
03/06/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 864)
12/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3213)
23/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1004)
03/02/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 861)
18/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3375)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/03/1918 05/10/1918 204 days General
Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1920 06/11/1920 50 days General  
Gorton Works 24/03/1923 30/06/1923 99 days General
Boiler number 1433 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1926 27/03/1926 57 days General
Boiler number 1126 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6230
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1929 15/06/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 15/08/1931 29/08/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1295 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1933 03/06/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1935 12/10/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1937 23/10/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1004 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1940 03/02/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1941 18/10/1941 20 days General
Boiler number 3375 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 772
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1230
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19886
Allocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/03/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1918. Dep: 05/10/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15)
   
18/09/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1920. Dep: 06/11/1920.    
24/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1923. Dep: 30/06/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1433 (Diagram 15)
   
30/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1926. Dep: 27/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1126 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6230
   
04/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1929. Dep: 15/06/1929.    
15/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1295 (Diagram 15)
   
13/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
28/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15)
   
04/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
09/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1937. Dep: 23/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1004 (Diagram 15)
   
20/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15)
   
29/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3375 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 772
   
18/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 772 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    

prev prev