Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 995 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7384 Week
» 27826 Month
» 364672 Year
» 1586237 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1231 m/e 11/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6231   16/02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3578   27/11/1946
British Railways 63578 w/e 28/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/111/1912
O113/10/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19887
To Service During 11/1912 to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 50 yrs , 17 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 6/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STV Staveley (G.C.) (New) m/e 11/1912
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 23/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse on 28/01/1943
GOR Gorton on 10/03/1943
CLK Colwick on 24/12/1944
GOR Gorton on 21/10/1945
38B Annesley on 16/07/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 16/07/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1497)
03/08/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1442)
19/03/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1243)
31/08/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1489)
24/10/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1172)
31/03/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1062)
02/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1114)
02/04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1231)
27/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1212)
21/08/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 943)
13/10/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5044)
02/1946 Drop Grate fitted
14/12/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5113)
28/01/1950 Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
14/02/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28257)
04/02/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28387)
20/04/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28901)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/03/1918 03/08/1918 141 days General
Boiler number 1442 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1921 12/03/1921 36 days General  
Gorton Works 24/11/1923 16/02/1924 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6231
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1926 19/03/1927 99 days General
Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1929 31/08/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 1489 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1931 24/10/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1172 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1934 31/03/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/04/1936 02/05/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1938 02/04/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1940 27/07/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1943 21/08/1943 13 days General
Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1945 13/10/1945 85 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5044 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 1946 02/1946   Unclassified
Drop Grate fitted
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1947 14/12/1947 37 days General
Boiler number 5113 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/01/1950 28/01/1950 27 days General
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63578
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1950 02/02/1950 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 29/04/1951 09/06/1951 42 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 23/01/1953 14/02/1953 23 days General
Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1954 27/02/1954 23 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 29/12/1954 04/02/1955 38 days General
Boiler number 28387 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1956 17/03/1956 25 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 22/02/1957 20/04/1957 58 days General
Boiler number 28901 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/08/1958 23/08/1958 16 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1961 11/03/1961 34 days Heavy Intermediate  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1231
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19887
Allocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/03/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1918. Dep: 03/08/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1442 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1921. Dep: 12/03/1921.    
24/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1923. Dep: 16/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6231
   
11/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1926. Dep: 19/03/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15)
   
27/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 31/08/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1489 (Diagram 15)
   
03/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1172 (Diagram 15)
   
24/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1934. Dep: 31/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15)
   
04/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1936. Dep: 02/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 15)
   
19/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1938. Dep: 02/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15)
   
13/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1940. Dep: 27/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
28/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
10/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
   
24/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5044 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 00/00/1946. Dep: 00/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Drop Grate fitted
   
27/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3578    
08/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1947. Dep: 14/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5113 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 28/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63578
   
31/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/01/1950. Dep: 02/02/1950.    
16/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
29/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1951. Dep: 09/06/1951.    
23/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1953. Dep: 14/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1954. Dep: 27/02/1954.    
29/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1954. Dep: 04/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28387 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1956. Dep: 17/03/1956.    
22/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1957. Dep: 20/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28901 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1958. Dep: 23/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
06/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/02/1961. Dep: 11/03/1961.    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63578 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev