|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/04/1919 | 23/08/1919 | 127 days | General | Boiler number 1482 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1921 | 24/09/1921 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1923 | 30/06/1923 | 92 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1925 | 05/09/1925 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6232 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1928 | 24/03/1928 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1930 | 31/05/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1932 | 01/10/1932 | 36 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/5 Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1935 | 16/02/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1937 | 15/05/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22343 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1939 | 20/01/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/09/1942 | 26/09/1942 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1945 | 28/04/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3653 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1947 | 13/03/1948 | 99 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5100 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3579 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1949 | 31/12/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 5010 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1950 | 16/01/1950 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1952 | 02/02/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28825 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1953 | 28/02/1953 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1953 | 21/11/1953 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1954 | 20/11/1954 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1955 | 26/01/1956 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28889 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1958 | 08/03/1958 | 34 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1958 | 22/03/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1959 | 15/12/1959 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1962 | 23/08/1962 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1946 | Crewe - Smoke deflectors | Smoke deflectors are being fitted to all the non-streamlined Princess Coronation locos in the same way as with 6232/52. 6234/3/50 have so far been so treated. | SLS/194605 |
30/03/1946 | W.D. ENGINES IN HOLLAND | The initials N.S. indicates Nederlandsche Spoorwegen, i.e. Netherlands Railways: this being not a State to concern but a limited liability company. Reference to the Netherlands State Railways is thus incorrect. Another point is that all W.D. locos in Holland are on to loan and have not been purchased. They still have their W.D. numbers in addition to their N.S numbers. Six more 0-6-0 saddle tanks are on loan:-N.S. 8822 to 8827, W.D. 75026/53/86, 75104/15/99. The 2-8-0's (W.D. 77125, 77238) which were allotted N.S. 4528/9 were in an accident last August, and were sent to Malines Works in Belgium. After overhaul, they went to to Western Germany, and so never bore their N.S. numbers. Ten more W.D. 2 8 0's went to the N.S. on loan in January, 1946:-N.S. 4528 to 4537, W.D. 77009/10, 77193/4/7, 77011/38, 77188/90, 77358. Of these, 77193/4/7 came from the Dutch State Mines in Limburg. At the same time N.S. 4511 (W.D. 79196) went to the State Mines (S.M.), while N.S. 4504/9 (W.D. 78677 and 79189) left for Belgium. These three locos. are no longer on the N.S. list. W.D. 77193 was S.M. 62. Also noted S.M. 74 (W.D. 75002). Sixty 2-10-0's are on loan to the N.S. from January, 1946:-N.S. 5001 to 5060: W.D. 73650/61/2/4-71/3/5/6/9-81/9-93/5-9, 73700/1/4-7/9/11-3/5/7-22/7/9/32-4/6-41/4/5/7-9. |
SLS/194605 |
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1232 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19888 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
19/04/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1919. Dep: 23/08/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1482 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/08/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1921. Dep: 24/09/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/10/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
31/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1923. Dep: 30/06/1923. | ||
18/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1925. Dep: 05/09/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6232 |
||
25/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1928. Dep: 24/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930. | ||
27/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1932. Dep: 01/10/1932. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/5 Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15A) |
||
08/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
02/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1935. Dep: 16/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15A) |
||
01/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1937. Dep: 15/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22343 (Diagram 15A) |
||
30/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1939. Dep: 20/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15A) |
||
23/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
30/04/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
09/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15A) |
||
11/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
24/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3653 (Diagram 15A) |
||
20/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3579 | ||
06/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1947. Dep: 13/03/1948. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5100 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3579 |
||
27/03/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63579 | ||
16/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
22/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
30/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1949. Dep: 31/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5010 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1950. Dep: 16/01/1950. | ||
08/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1952. Dep: 02/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28825 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953. | ||
02/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. | ||
05/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954. | ||
14/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1955. Dep: 26/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28889 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
14/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
03/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1958. Dep: 08/03/1958. | ||
19/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1958. Dep: 22/03/1958. | ||
17/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1959. Dep: 15/12/1959. | ||
23/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1962. Dep: 23/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63579 from Annesley (16D) |