Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 94 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5202 Week
» 34700 Month
» 371546 Year
» 1593111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1232 m/e 11/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6232   05/09/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3579   20/12/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3579   13/03/1948
British Railways 63579 w/e 27/03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/111/1912
O4/501/10/1932
O113/03/1948
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19888
To Service During 11/1912
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 50 yrs , 24 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1912
STV Staveley (G.C.) on 06/10/1922
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 08/02/1934
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 23/11/1940
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 30/04/1941
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 11/04/1943
ANN Annesley on 16/01/1949
31B March on 24/02/1957
38B Annesley on 14/04/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 24/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 22/01/1949
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 20/04/1957
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 24/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1498)
23/08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1482)
24/09/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1937)
24/03/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 862)
01/10/1932 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 639)
16/02/1935 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 1084)
15/05/1937 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 622)
20/01/1940 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 1084)
26/09/1942 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 621)
28/04/1945 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3653)
13/03/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5100)
31/12/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5010)
02/02/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28825)
21/11/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28339)
26/01/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28889)
23/08/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28813)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/04/1919 23/08/1919 127 days General
Boiler number 1482 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1921 24/09/1921 36 days General
Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1923 30/06/1923 92 days General  
Gorton Works 18/07/1925 05/09/1925 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6232
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1928 24/03/1928 29 days General
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1930 31/05/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 27/08/1932 01/10/1932 36 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1935 16/02/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1937 15/05/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 22343 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1939 20/01/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 09/09/1942 26/09/1942 18 days General
Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1945 28/04/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 3653 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1947 13/03/1948 99 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5100 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3579
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1949 31/12/1949 32 days General
Boiler number 5010 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 03/01/1950 16/01/1950 14 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 08/01/1952 02/02/1952 26 days General
Boiler number 28825 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1953 28/02/1953 27 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 02/11/1953 21/11/1953 20 days General
Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1954 10/04/1954 25 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/10/1954 20/11/1954 47 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 14/12/1955 26/01/1956 44 days General
Boiler number 28889 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1958 08/03/1958 34 days General  
Gorton Works 19/03/1958 22/03/1958 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/11/1959 15/12/1959 29 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 23/06/1962 23/08/1962 62 days General
Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1946 Crewe - Smoke deflectors Smoke deflectors are being fitted to all the non-streamlined Princess Coronation locos in the same way as with 6232/52. 6234/3/50 have so far been so treated. SLS/194605
30/03/1946 W.D. ENGINES IN HOLLAND The initials N.S. indicates Nederlandsche Spoorwegen, i.e. Netherlands Railways: this being not a State to concern but a limited liability company. Reference to the Netherlands State Railways is thus incorrect.
Another point is that all W.D. locos in Holland are on to loan and have not been purchased. They still have their W.D. numbers in addition to their N.S numbers.
Six more 0-6-0 saddle tanks are on loan:-N.S. 8822 to 8827, W.D. 75026/53/86, 75104/15/99.
The 2-8-0's (W.D. 77125, 77238) which were allotted N.S. 4528/9 were in an accident last August, and were sent to Malines Works in Belgium. After overhaul, they went to to Western Germany, and so never bore their N.S. numbers. Ten more W.D. 2 8 0's went to the N.S. on loan in January, 1946:-N.S. 4528 to 4537, W.D. 77009/10, 77193/4/7, 77011/38, 77188/90, 77358. Of these, 77193/4/7 came from the Dutch State Mines in Limburg. At the same time N.S. 4511 (W.D. 79196) went to the State Mines (S.M.), while N.S. 4504/9 (W.D. 78677 and 79189) left for Belgium. These three locos. are no longer on the N.S. list. W.D. 77193 was S.M. 62.
Also noted S.M. 74 (W.D. 75002).
Sixty 2-10-0's are on loan to the N.S. from January, 1946:-N.S. 5001 to 5060: W.D. 73650/61/2/4-71/3/5/6/9-81/9-93/5-9, 73700/1/4-7/9/11-3/5/7-22/7/9/32-4/6-41/4/5/7-9.
SLS/194605
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1232
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19888
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
19/04/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1919. Dep: 23/08/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1482 (Diagram 15)
   
20/08/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1921. Dep: 24/09/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15)
   
06/10/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
31/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1923. Dep: 30/06/1923.    
18/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1925. Dep: 05/09/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6232
   
25/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1928. Dep: 24/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
   
26/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930.    
27/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1932. Dep: 01/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15A)
   
08/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
02/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1935. Dep: 16/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15A)
   
01/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1937. Dep: 15/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22343 (Diagram 15A)
   
30/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1939. Dep: 20/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15A)
   
23/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
30/04/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
09/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15A)
   
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
24/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3653 (Diagram 15A)
   
20/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3579    
06/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1947. Dep: 13/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5100 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3579
   
27/03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63579    
16/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1949. Dep: 31/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5010 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1950. Dep: 16/01/1950.    
08/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1952. Dep: 02/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28825 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953.    
02/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954.    
05/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954.    
14/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1955. Dep: 26/01/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28889 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
03/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1958. Dep: 08/03/1958.    
19/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1958. Dep: 22/03/1958.    
17/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1959. Dep: 15/12/1959.    
23/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1962. Dep: 23/08/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63579 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev