Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 113 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1038 Week
» 18374 Month
» 296170 Year
» 1180551 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1237 m/e 11/1912
LNER (1924) 6237   14/02/1925
LNER (1946) 3584   15/12/1946
BR 63584 w/e 28/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19893
To Service During 11/1912
Withdrawal Wed 08/08/1962 off Ardsley (56B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 49 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 8/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 01/11/1914
KEA Keadby 22/12/1931
FRO Frodingham 12/06/1932
39B Sheffield Darnall 01/07/1951
37A Ardsley 20/12/1953
   Withdrawn 08/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 26/12/1953
WDN   08/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1503)
20/07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1743)
14/02/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1219)
09/02/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1306)
17/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1302)
18/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1336)
02/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3214)
09/12/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1414)
01/08/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3332)
11/11/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3393)
21/06/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1149)
28/01/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 804)
08/11/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22876)
31/12/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22142)
18/06/1960 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22192)
30/07/1960 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/03/1918 20/07/1918 134 days General
Boiler number 1743 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1920 03/07/1920 57 days General  
Gorton Works 26/08/1922 04/11/1922 71 days General  
Gorton Works 20/12/1924 14/02/1925 57 days General
Boiler number 1219 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6237
 
Gorton Works 11/09/1926 20/11/1926 71 days General  
Gorton Works 03/11/1928 09/02/1929 99 days General
Boiler number 1306 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/09/1930 11/10/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 03/12/1932 17/12/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1302 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1935 18/05/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1336 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1937 02/10/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1939 09/12/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1942 01/08/1942 13 days General
Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1944 11/11/1944 8 days General
Boiler number 3393 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1947 21/06/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1950 28/01/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63584
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1952 08/11/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 22876 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1955 31/12/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 22142 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1960 18/06/1960 43 days General
Boiler number 22192 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1960 30/07/1960 29 days General  
Gorton Works 30/07/1960 06/08/1960 8 days Light Casual
After collision
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1237
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19893
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/11/1914 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
09/03/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1918. Dep: 20/07/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1743 (Diagram 15)
   
08/05/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1920. Dep: 03/07/1920.    
26/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1922. Dep: 04/11/1922.    
20/12/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1924. Dep: 14/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1219 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6237
   
11/09/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1926. Dep: 20/11/1926.    
03/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1306 (Diagram 15)
   
06/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1930. Dep: 11/10/1930.    
22/12/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
12/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
03/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1932. Dep: 17/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1302 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1935. Dep: 18/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1336 (Diagram 15)
   
04/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15)
   
25/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15)
   
20/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1942. Dep: 01/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15)
   
04/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3393 (Diagram 15)
   
15/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3584    
17/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
   
14/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1950. Dep: 28/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63584
   
01/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
25/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22876 (Diagram 15)
   
20/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
26/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1955. Dep: 31/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22142 (Diagram 15)
   
07/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1960. Dep: 18/06/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22192 (Diagram 15)
   
02/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1960. Dep: 30/07/1960.    
30/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1960. Dep: 06/08/1960.
Work undertaken:
After collision
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
08/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63584 from Ardsley (56B)    

prev prev