|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 10/06/1916 | 19/09/1916 | 102 days | General | Boiler number 1636 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1921 | 05/02/1921 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1923 | 08/12/1923 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1467 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/04/1926 | 17/07/1926 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6238 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1928 | 08/12/1928 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1161 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1931 | 14/03/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1469 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1933 | 30/09/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1935 | 18/01/1936 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 1193 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1937 | 25/12/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1939 | 25/11/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1941 | 04/10/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 866 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1238 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19894 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
17/03/1915 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
10/06/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1916. Dep: 19/09/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1636 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/01/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1921. Dep: 05/02/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1923. Dep: 08/12/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1467 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1926. Dep: 17/07/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6238 |
||
01/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1928. Dep: 08/12/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1161 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 14/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1469 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1933. Dep: 30/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1193 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
18/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1937. Dep: 25/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 761 from Annesley (ANN) | ||
19/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 761 | ||
22/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 866 (Diagram 15) |