Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 348 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3896 Week
» 4786 Month
» 312767 Year
» 1197148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1239 m/e 12/1912
LNER (1924) 6239   02/02/1924
War Dept. 705   21/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19895
To Service During 12/1912 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Sun 21/09/1941 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 28 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 705 and sent to Middle East via Birkenhead, 19/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 12/1912
ANN Annesley 16/02/1924
FRO Frodingham 28/09/1939
   Withdrawn 21/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1505)
06/04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1480)
09/07/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1888)
12/01/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1877)
11/04/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1456)
06/05/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 857)
03/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1838)
05/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1020)
03/06/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1961)
30/08/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1367)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 20/10/1917 06/04/1918 169 days General
Boiler number 1480 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1921 09/07/1921 36 days General
Boiler number 1888 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1923 02/02/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6239
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1926 30/10/1926 92 days General  
Gorton Works 20/10/1928 12/01/1929 85 days General
Boiler number 1877 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/03/1931 11/04/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1933 06/05/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1935 03/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1838 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/05/1937 05/06/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1939 03/06/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1941 30/08/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1239
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19895
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
20/10/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1917. Dep: 06/04/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1480 (Diagram 15)
   
04/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1921. Dep: 09/07/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1888 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1923. Dep: 02/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6239
   
16/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
31/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1926. Dep: 30/10/1926.    
20/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1928. Dep: 12/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1877 (Diagram 15)
   
21/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1931. Dep: 11/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15)
   
22/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15)
   
20/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1935. Dep: 03/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1838 (Diagram 15)
   
15/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1937. Dep: 05/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15)
   
13/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 03/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15)
   
28/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
18/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15)
   
21/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 705 from Frodingham (FRO)    
21/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 705    

prev prev