Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 235 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 235 Week
» 17571 Month
» 295367 Year
» 1179748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1240 m/e 12/1912
LNER (1924) 6240   02/04/1926
LNER (1946) 3587   07/12/1946
BR 63587 w/e 10/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19896
To Service During 12/1912
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 49 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 8/10/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 20/10/1922
KEA Keadby m/e 1923
IMM Immingham 09/06/1924
TUX Tuxford 18/01/1929
IMM Immingham 02/02/1929
TUX Tuxford 20/12/1932
LIN Lincoln 20/05/1937
LNG Langwith Junction 07/10/1941
DON Doncaster 12/01/1947
FRO Frodingham 18/01/1948
38D Staveley (G.C.) 18/03/1951
38A Colwick 01/01/1956
   Withdrawn 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster 12/01/1947
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 28/01/1956
WDN   23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1506)
26/05/1917 Diagram 15Sat boiler fitted (number 1173)
29/10/1921 Ross Pop safety valves fitted
29/10/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1942)
12/05/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1165)
12/07/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1274)
19/11/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1880)
12/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1089)
20/11/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 117)
09/03/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 813)
12/09/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 42)
09/09/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3284)
07/12/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3277)
24/12/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3206)
10/05/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22268)
02/10/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22256)
05/03/1960 Water Treatment apparatus fitted
05/03/1960 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22171)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 13/01/1917 26/05/1917 134 days General
Saturated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1173 (Diagram 15Sat)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1921 29/10/1921 29 days General
Boiler number 1942 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1923 01/09/1923 106 days General  
Gorton Works 09/01/1926 03/04/1926 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6240
 
Gorton Works 07/04/1928 12/05/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 1165 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1930 12/07/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1274 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1932 19/11/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1880 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1935 12/10/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1937 20/11/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 117 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1940 09/03/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1942 12/09/1942 19 days General
Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1944 09/09/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1946 07/12/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 3277 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3587
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1948 03/07/1948 22 days Heavy
Renumbered to BR 63587
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1949 24/12/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1952 10/05/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22268 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1954 02/10/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 22256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1957 24/09/1957 74 days General  
Gorton Works 30/01/1960 05/03/1960 36 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22171 (Diagram 15)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1240
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19896
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
13/01/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1917. Dep: 26/05/1917.
Work undertaken:
Saturated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1173 (Diagram 15Sat)
   
01/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1921. Dep: 29/10/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1942 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
   
20/10/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
1923 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
19/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1923. Dep: 01/09/1923.    
09/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
09/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1926. Dep: 03/04/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6240
   
07/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1928. Dep: 12/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1165 (Diagram 15)
   
18/01/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
02/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
21/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1930. Dep: 12/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1274 (Diagram 15)
   
05/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1932. Dep: 19/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1880 (Diagram 15)
   
20/12/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
21/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15)
   
20/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
13/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1937. Dep: 20/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 117 (Diagram 15)
   
24/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
   
07/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
25/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15)
   
26/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1944. Dep: 09/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15)
   
09/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3277 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3587
   
12/01/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
12/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/06/1948. Dep: 03/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63587
   
03/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1949. Dep: 24/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15)
   
18/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
19/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1952. Dep: 10/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22268 (Diagram 15)
   
04/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1954. Dep: 02/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22256 (Diagram 15)
   
01/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
13/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1957. Dep: 24/09/1957.    
30/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/01/1960. Dep: 05/03/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22171 (Diagram 15)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63587 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev