Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 679 Today
» 1287 Yesterday
» 1966 Week
» 31552 Month
» 405565 Year
» 1627130 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1241 m/e 12/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6241   22/11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3588   17/11/1946
British Railways 63588 w/e 31/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/112/1912
O4/711/11/1939
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19897
To Service During 12/1912
Withdrawal Wed 08/08/1962 off Wakefield (56A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 49 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 12/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1912
MEX Mexborough on 17/03/1917
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
TUX Tuxford on 06/03/1949
37A Ardsley on 27/09/1953
56A Wakefield on 22/02/1959
   Withdrawn on 08/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TUX Tuxford w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   on 08/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1507)
26/01/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1508)
22/11/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1862)
14/09/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1305)
19/03/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1028)
29/09/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1485)
05/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1389)
11/11/1939 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3656)
20/01/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3686)
09/02/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3690)
31/07/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3693)
24/02/1951 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22314)
18/04/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22306)
31/03/1956 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22872)
08/10/1960 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/08/1917 26/01/1918 162 days General
Boiler number 1508 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1922 04/11/1922 85 days General  
Gorton Works 02/08/1924 22/11/1924 113 days General
Boiler number 1862 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6241
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1927 07/05/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 03/08/1929 14/09/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 1305 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1932 19/03/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1028 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1934 29/09/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1937 05/06/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 1389 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1939 11/11/1939 15 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3656 (Diagram 15D)
 
Stratford Works 02/12/1942 20/01/1943 50 days General
Boiler number 3686 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1944 01/07/1944 11 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 15/01/1946 09/02/1946 26 days General
Boiler number 3690 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1948 31/07/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 3693 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63588
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1951 24/02/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22314 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1951 03/03/1951 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 18/04/1952 26/04/1952 9 days Light Casual
Tender changed
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1953 18/04/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1956 31/03/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22872 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 04/04/1956 06/04/1956 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 27/08/1960 08/10/1960 43 days Heavy Intermediate
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1241
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19897
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
17/03/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/08/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1917. Dep: 26/01/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1508 (Diagram 15)
   
12/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1922. Dep: 04/11/1922.    
02/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1924. Dep: 22/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1862 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6241
   
26/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 07/05/1927.    
03/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1929. Dep: 14/09/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1305 (Diagram 15)
   
12/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1028 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1934. Dep: 29/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15)
   
29/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1937. Dep: 05/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1389 (Diagram 15)
   
28/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 11/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3656 (Diagram 15D)
   
02/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1942. Dep: 20/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3686 (Diagram 15D)
   
21/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/06/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944.    
15/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3690 (Diagram 15D)
   
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3588    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
26/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1948. Dep: 31/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3693 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63588
   
06/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
03/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1951. Dep: 24/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22314 (Diagram 15D)
   
28/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951.    
18/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/04/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender changed
   
28/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D)
   
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
03/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1956. Dep: 31/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22872 (Diagram 15D)
   
04/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/04/1956. Dep: 06/04/1956.    
22/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
27/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/08/1960. Dep: 08/10/1960.
Work undertaken:
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
08/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63588 from Wakefield (56A)    

prev prev