|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 18/08/1917 | 26/01/1918 | 162 days | General | Boiler number 1508 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1922 | 04/11/1922 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1924 | 22/11/1924 | 113 days | General | Boiler number 1862 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6241 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1927 | 07/05/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1929 | 14/09/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1305 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1932 | 19/03/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1028 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1934 | 29/09/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1937 | 05/06/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1389 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1939 | 11/11/1939 | 15 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3656 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Stratford Works | 02/12/1942 | 20/01/1943 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3686 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1944 | 01/07/1944 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1946 | 09/02/1946 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3690 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1948 | 31/07/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3693 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63588 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1951 | 24/02/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22314 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1951 | 03/03/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 18/04/1952 | 26/04/1952 | 9 days | Light Casual | Tender changed |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1953 | 18/04/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1956 | 31/03/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22872 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/04/1956 | 06/04/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1960 | 08/10/1960 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1241 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19897 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
17/03/1917 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
18/08/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1917. Dep: 26/01/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1508 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1922. Dep: 04/11/1922. | ||
02/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1924. Dep: 22/11/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1862 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6241 |
||
26/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 07/05/1927. | ||
03/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1929. Dep: 14/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1305 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1028 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1934. Dep: 29/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1937. Dep: 05/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1389 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 11/11/1939. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3656 (Diagram 15D) |
||
02/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1942. Dep: 20/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3686 (Diagram 15D) |
||
21/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/06/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944. | ||
15/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3690 (Diagram 15D) |
||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3588 | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
26/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1948. Dep: 31/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3693 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63588 |
||
06/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX) | ||
12/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX) | ||
03/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1951. Dep: 24/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22314 (Diagram 15D) |
||
28/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951. | ||
18/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/04/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952. Work undertaken: Tender changed |
||
28/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D) |
||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
03/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1956. Dep: 31/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22872 (Diagram 15D) |
||
04/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/04/1956. Dep: 06/04/1956. | ||
22/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
27/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/08/1960. Dep: 08/10/1960. Work undertaken: Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
08/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63588 from Wakefield (56A) |