Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 140 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1180 Week
» 11350 Month
» 289146 Year
» 1173527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1242 m/e 12/1912
LNER (1924) 6242   23/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3589   16/12/1946
BR 63589 w/e 30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/112/1912
O4/501/10/1932
O128/04/1949
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19898
To Service During 12/1912 to Immingham (IMM)
Withdrawal Sun 11/07/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Mon 25/10/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 52 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull. Cut up 25/10/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham (New) m/e 12/1912
KEA Keadby 06/11/1930
FRO Frodingham 12/06/1932
ANN Annesley 22/01/1939
ARD Ardsley 30/05/1939
GOR Gorton 01/07/1939
CLK Colwick 24/12/1944
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
LNG Langwith Junction 20/02/1948
ANN Annesley 30/04/1949
38A Colwick 03/11/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 09/06/1963
41J Langwith Junction 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 11/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 13/03/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1508)
29/09/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1477)
11/02/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1945)
11/02/1922 Ross Pop safety valves fitted
12/05/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 872)
22/02/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1481)
01/10/1932 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 622)
17/10/1936 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 621)
22/10/1938 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 615)
23/08/1941 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3651)
20/11/1943 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 622)
21/12/1946 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3652)
28/04/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5109)
09/02/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28289)
21/02/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28840)
05/02/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28391)
16/02/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28855)
12/12/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28811)
30/11/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28957)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/07/1917 29/09/1917 85 days General
Boiler number 1477 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1921 11/02/1922 50 days General
Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
 
Gorton Works 05/01/1924 23/02/1924 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6242
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1925 13/02/1926 64 days General  
Gorton Works 14/04/1928 12/05/1928 29 days General
Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1930 22/02/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1481 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1932 01/10/1932 29 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 622 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1934 18/08/1934 29 days General  
Gorton Works 03/10/1936 17/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1938 22/10/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1941 23/08/1941 17 days General
Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1943 20/11/1943 17 days General
Boiler number 622 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1946 21/12/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 3652 (Diagram 15A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3589
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1949 28/04/1949 104 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5109 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63589
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1950 09/02/1951 90 days General
Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/02/1953 21/02/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 28840 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1955 05/02/1955 22 days General
Boiler number 28391 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1957 16/02/1957 22 days General
Boiler number 28855 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1959 12/12/1959 27 days General
Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 28/09/1962 30/11/1962 64 days General
Boiler number 28957 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1242
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19898
Allocated to Immingham (IMM)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
07/07/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1917. Dep: 29/09/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1477 (Diagram 15)
   
24/12/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1921. Dep: 11/02/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
   
05/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1924. Dep: 23/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6242
   
12/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1925. Dep: 13/02/1926.    
14/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1928. Dep: 12/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15)
   
25/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1481 (Diagram 15)
   
06/11/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
12/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
03/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1932. Dep: 01/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 622 (Diagram 15A)
   
21/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934.    
03/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15A)
   
01/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15A)
   
22/01/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/05/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
01/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1941. Dep: 23/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A)
   
04/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 622 (Diagram 15A)
   
24/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3652 (Diagram 15A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3589
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
20/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
15/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1949. Dep: 28/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5109 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63589
   
30/04/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
12/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1950. Dep: 09/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1953. Dep: 21/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28840 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1955. Dep: 05/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28391 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1957. Dep: 16/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28855 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
16/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1959. Dep: 12/12/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/09/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1962. Dep: 30/11/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28957 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
11/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63589 from Langwith Junction (41J)    
25/10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev