Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 132 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4263 Week
» 14433 Month
» 292229 Year
» 1176610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1243 m/e 12/1912
LNER (1924) 6243   31/07/1924
LNER (1946) 3590   17/11/1946
BR 63590 w/e 08/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/112/1912
O116/12/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19899
To Service During 12/1912
Withdrawal Sun 11/07/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Mon 04/10/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 52 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull, 8/65 Cut up 4/10/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 17/02/1917
IMM Immingham 20/10/1922
KEA Keadby 15/11/1929
FRO Frodingham 12/06/1932
GOR Gorton 07/01/1945
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 26/11/1950
31B March 03/03/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 15/11/1959
41J Langwith Junction 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 11/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1509)
22/12/1916 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1504)
27/02/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1600)
22/03/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1524)
09/09/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1150)
15/02/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1235)
29/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1102)
22/09/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1282)
02/03/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3207)
05/12/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3393)
16/12/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5014)
22/03/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5036)
17/05/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28832)
18/03/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28363)
14/04/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28314)
13/09/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28379)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/11/1916 22/12/1916 32 days General
Boiler number 1504 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1920 05/02/1920 28 days General  
Gorton Works 06/02/1922 27/02/1922 22 days General
Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1924 31/07/1924 62 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6243
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1926 22/03/1927 137 days General
Boiler number 1524 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/03/1929 19/04/1929 45 days General  
Gorton Works 28/07/1930 09/09/1930 44 days General
Boiler number 1150 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1933 15/02/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1935 29/06/1935 41 days General
Boiler number 1102 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/08/1937 22/09/1937 26 days General
Boiler number 1282 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1940 02/03/1940 46 days General
Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1943 05/12/1943 56 days General
Boiler number 3393 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1944 16/12/1944 84 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5014 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1947 22/03/1947 43 days General
Boiler number 5036 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1949 01/07/1949 28 days General
Renumbered to BR 63590
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1950 22/04/1950 34 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 16/10/1950 16/12/1950 62 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 10/04/1951 26/05/1951 47 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 17/11/1951 24/11/1951 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 18/04/1952 17/05/1952 30 days General
Boiler number 28832 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1954 18/03/1954 31 days General
Boiler number 28363 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1955 02/04/1955 40 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 06/03/1956 14/04/1956 40 days General
Boiler number 28314 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1958 13/09/1958 39 days General
Boiler number 28379 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1960 16/03/1960 36 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 09/07/1962 20/09/1962 74 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1243
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19899
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
21/11/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1916. Dep: 22/12/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1504 (Diagram 15)
   
17/02/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
09/01/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1920. Dep: 05/02/1920.    
06/02/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1922. Dep: 27/02/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15)
   
20/10/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
31/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1924. Dep: 31/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6243
   
06/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1926. Dep: 22/03/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1524 (Diagram 15)
   
06/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1929. Dep: 19/04/1929.    
15/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
28/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1930. Dep: 09/09/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1150 (Diagram 15)
   
12/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
11/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1933. Dep: 15/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15)
   
20/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1102 (Diagram 15)
   
28/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1937. Dep: 22/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1282 (Diagram 15)
   
17/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15)
   
11/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1943. Dep: 05/12/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3393 (Diagram 15)
   
24/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1944. Dep: 16/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5014 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3590    
08/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5036 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1949. Dep: 01/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63590
   
20/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1950. Dep: 22/04/1950.    
16/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1950. Dep: 16/12/1950.    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
10/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/04/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951.    
17/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1951. Dep: 24/11/1951.    
18/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1952. Dep: 17/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28832 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1954. Dep: 18/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28363 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1955. Dep: 02/04/1955.    
06/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1956. Dep: 14/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28314 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
06/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1958. Dep: 13/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28379 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
10/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/02/1960. Dep: 16/03/1960.    
09/07/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1962. Dep: 20/09/1962.    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
11/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63590 from Langwith Junction (41J)    
04/10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev