Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 129 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7870 Week
» 28312 Month
» 365158 Year
» 1586723 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1244 m/e 12/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6244   15/11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3591   22/12/1946
British Railways 63591 w/e 10/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/112/1912
O115/04/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19900
To Service During 12/1912
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 49 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1912
IMM Immingham on 06/02/1920
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 09/12/1930
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 14/12/1930
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 01/02/1934
GRA Grantham on 27/09/1939
DON Doncaster on 21/11/1942
GOR Gorton on 07/02/1943
NWE New England on 15/05/1944
GOR Gorton on 25/06/1945
38B Annesley on 26/11/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1510)
29/11/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1511)
17/06/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1477)
17/06/1922 Ross Pop
15/11/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 145)
29/11/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1946)
07/01/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1165)
23/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1178)
01/05/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1359)
05/08/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1954)
06/12/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3247)
15/04/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9430)
07/07/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5033)
12/10/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28265)
29/11/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28386)
02/10/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28829)
22/11/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28811)
07/08/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28268)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/10/1919 29/11/1919 43 days General
Boiler number 1511 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1922 17/06/1922 50 days General
Boiler number 1477 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1924 15/11/1924 78 days General
Boiler number 145 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6244
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1926 18/12/1926 64 days General  
Gorton Works 28/07/1928 15/09/1928 50 days General  
Gorton Works 08/11/1930 29/11/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1946 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1932 07/01/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 1165 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1935 23/03/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 1178 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1937 01/05/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1359 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1939 05/08/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1941 06/12/1941 16 days General
Boiler number 3247 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1942 09/01/1943 22 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1943 15/04/1944 121 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 9430 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1945 21/03/1945 9 days General  
Gorton Works 08/07/1946 24/08/1946 48 days General  
Gorton Works 07/06/1948 07/07/1948 31 days General
Boiler number 5033 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63591
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1950 12/10/1950 39 days General
Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1950 02/11/1950 16 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 12/01/1952 29/02/1952 49 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 10/11/1952 29/11/1952 20 days General
Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1954 02/10/1954 34 days General
Boiler number 28829 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1955 08/10/1955 39 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 17/11/1956 22/11/1956 6 days General
Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1958 22/02/1958 31 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 25/06/1959 07/08/1959 44 days General
Boiler number 28268 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1962 10/05/1962 44 days Light Intermediate  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1244
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19900
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
18/10/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1919. Dep: 29/11/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1511 (Diagram 15)
   
06/02/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
29/04/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1922. Dep: 17/06/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1477 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop
   
30/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1924. Dep: 15/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 145 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6244
   
16/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1926. Dep: 18/12/1926.    
28/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1928. Dep: 15/09/1928.    
08/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1946 (Diagram 15)
   
09/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
14/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
17/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1932. Dep: 07/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1165 (Diagram 15)
   
01/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
02/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1935. Dep: 23/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1178 (Diagram 15)
   
17/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1937. Dep: 01/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1359 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 05/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15)
   
27/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
21/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1941. Dep: 06/12/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3247 (Diagram 15)
   
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
19/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
07/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1943. Dep: 15/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 9430 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
13/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1945. Dep: 21/03/1945.    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946.    
22/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3591    
07/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1948. Dep: 07/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5033 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63591
   
04/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1950. Dep: 12/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/10/1950. Dep: 02/11/1950.    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
12/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1952. Dep: 29/02/1952.    
10/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1952. Dep: 29/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1954. Dep: 02/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28829 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/08/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955.    
17/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1956. Dep: 22/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/01/1958. Dep: 22/02/1958.    
25/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1959. Dep: 07/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28268 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/03/1962. Dep: 10/05/1962.    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63591 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev