Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 43 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1968 Week
» 19304 Month
» 297100 Year
» 1181481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1245 m/e 12/1912
LNER (1924) 6245   21/06/1924
LNER (1946) 3592   18/11/1946
BR 63592 w/e 31/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/112/1912
O105/10/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19901
To Service During 12/1912 to Immingham (IMM)
Withdrawal Tue 23/07/1963 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 50 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 12/8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham (New) m/e 12/1912
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 09/12/1930
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 14/12/1930
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 23/03/1934
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 23/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse 03/02/1943
GOR Gorton 10/03/1943
CLK Colwick 24/11/1944
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 26/11/1950
38A Colwick 03/11/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 09/06/1963
   Withdrawn 23/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/06/1963
WDN   23/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1511)
02/08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1502)
14/01/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1443)
21/06/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 518)
06/11/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1500)
23/02/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 154)
02/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1071)
24/06/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1429)
31/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1200)
02/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1945)
10/02/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1250)
18/09/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3311)
05/10/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5085)
31/07/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5053)
03/02/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28806)
03/05/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28380)
17/04/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28824)
10/09/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28448)
03/11/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28853)
15/01/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28363)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/04/1919 02/08/1919 113 days General
Boiler number 1502 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1921 14/01/1922 43 days General
Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/05/1924 21/06/1924 43 days General
Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6245
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1926 06/11/1926 120 days General
Boiler number 1500 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1928 23/02/1929 85 days General
Boiler number 154 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/04/1931 02/05/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1071 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/06/1933 24/06/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1935 31/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1200 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1937 02/10/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1940 10/02/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 1250 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/09/1943 18/09/1943 12 days General
Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1946 05/10/1946 113 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5085 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1948 31/07/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 5053 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63592
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1951 03/02/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1952 03/05/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 28380 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1952 11/05/1952 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/03/1954 17/04/1954 34 days General
Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1954 27/04/1954 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 27/02/1955 20/04/1955 53 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 30/06/1955 10/09/1955 73 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28448 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1956 03/11/1956 44 days General
Boiler number 28853 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1959 15/01/1960 35 days General
Boiler number 28363 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1960 11/03/1960 8 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1245
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19901
Allocated to Immingham (IMM)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/04/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1919. Dep: 02/08/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1502 (Diagram 15)
   
03/12/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1921. Dep: 14/01/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15)
   
10/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1924. Dep: 21/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6245
   
10/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1926. Dep: 06/11/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1500 (Diagram 15)
   
01/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1928. Dep: 23/02/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 154 (Diagram 15)
   
09/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
14/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
11/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1071 (Diagram 15)
   
03/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1933. Dep: 24/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15)
   
23/03/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
17/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1935. Dep: 31/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1200 (Diagram 15)
   
04/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15)
   
03/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1250 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
03/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
10/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
15/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5085 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3592    
26/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1948. Dep: 31/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5053 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63592
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
20/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1951. Dep: 03/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28380 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 11/05/1952.    
15/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 17/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1954. Dep: 27/04/1954.    
27/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/02/1955. Dep: 20/04/1955.    
30/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/06/1955. Dep: 10/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28448 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1956. Dep: 03/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28853 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
12/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1959. Dep: 15/01/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28363 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1960. Dep: 11/03/1960.    
09/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
23/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63592 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev