|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/04/1919 | 02/08/1919 | 113 days | General | Boiler number 1502 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1921 | 14/01/1922 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1924 | 21/06/1924 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6245 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/07/1926 | 06/11/1926 | 120 days | General | Boiler number 1500 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1928 | 23/02/1929 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 154 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1931 | 02/05/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1071 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/06/1933 | 24/06/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1935 | 31/08/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1200 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1937 | 02/10/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1940 | 10/02/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1250 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/09/1943 | 18/09/1943 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1946 | 05/10/1946 | 113 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5085 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1948 | 31/07/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 5053 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63592 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1951 | 03/02/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1952 | 03/05/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28380 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1952 | 11/05/1952 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1954 | 17/04/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1954 | 27/04/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1955 | 20/04/1955 | 53 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1955 | 10/09/1955 | 73 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28448 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1956 | 03/11/1956 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28853 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1959 | 15/01/1960 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28363 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1960 | 11/03/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1245 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19901 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/04/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1919. Dep: 02/08/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1502 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/12/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1921. Dep: 14/01/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1924. Dep: 21/06/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6245 |
||
10/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1926. Dep: 06/11/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1500 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1928. Dep: 23/02/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 154 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
14/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
11/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1071 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1933. Dep: 24/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/03/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
17/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1935. Dep: 31/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1200 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1250 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
03/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
10/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
15/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5085 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3592 | ||
26/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1948. Dep: 31/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5053 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63592 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
20/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1951. Dep: 03/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28380 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 11/05/1952. | ||
15/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 17/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1954. Dep: 27/04/1954. | ||
27/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/02/1955. Dep: 20/04/1955. | ||
30/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/06/1955. Dep: 10/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28448 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1956. Dep: 03/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28853 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
12/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1959. Dep: 15/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28363 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1960. Dep: 11/03/1960. | ||
09/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
23/07/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63592 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |