Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 140 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1180 Week
» 11350 Month
» 289146 Year
» 1173527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1248 m/e 12/1912
LNER (1924) 6248   24/04/1926
LNER (1946) 3595   09/12/1946
BR 63595 w/e 05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/112/1912
O4/731/08/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19904
To Service During 12/1912
Withdrawal Fri 21/04/1961 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 48 yrs, 4 mths , 22 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 17/11/1922
KEA Keadby 06/11/1930
FRO Frodingham 12/06/1932
   Withdrawn 21/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   21/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1514)
18/01/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1465)
20/08/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1503)
22/12/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1871)
28/07/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1355)
06/09/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1244)
29/04/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1264)
31/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1886)
09/04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 487)
31/08/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3671)
01/05/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3690)
05/01/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3693)
05/06/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3666)
24/06/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3664)
20/09/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22310)
26/03/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22329)
24/05/1958 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22871)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 20/08/1918 18/01/1919 152 days General
Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1921 20/08/1921 50 days General
Boiler number 1503 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1923 22/12/1923 64 days General
Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1926 24/04/1926 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6248
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1928 28/07/1928 64 days General
Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1930 06/09/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1244 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1933 29/04/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1935 31/12/1935 11 days General
Boiler number 1886 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1938 09/04/1938 15 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1940 31/08/1940 22 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 15/04/1943 01/05/1943 17 days General
Boiler number 3690 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1944 25/03/1944 12 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 08/12/1945 05/01/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 3693 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1948 05/06/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63595
 
Gorton Works 03/06/1950 24/06/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1952 20/09/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1955 26/03/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22329 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1956 22/12/1956 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 19/04/1958 24/05/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 22871 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 15/04/1961 15/04/1961 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1248
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19904
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
20/08/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1918. Dep: 18/01/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15)
   
02/07/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1921. Dep: 20/08/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1503 (Diagram 15)
   
17/11/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
20/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1926. Dep: 24/04/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6248
   
26/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1928. Dep: 28/07/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15)
   
09/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1930. Dep: 06/09/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1244 (Diagram 15)
   
06/11/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
12/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
22/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1933. Dep: 29/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 15)
   
21/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1935. Dep: 31/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1886 (Diagram 15)
   
26/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1938. Dep: 09/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15)
   
10/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1940. Dep: 31/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D)
   
15/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3690 (Diagram 15D)
   
14/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/03/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944.    
08/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3693 (Diagram 15D)
   
09/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3595    
08/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63595
   
03/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1950. Dep: 24/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D)
   
30/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D)
   
26/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22329 (Diagram 15D)
   
15/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/12/1956. Dep: 22/12/1956.    
19/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1958. Dep: 24/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22871 (Diagram 15D)
   
15/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/04/1961. Dep: 15/04/1961.    
21/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63595 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev