Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 54 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 5562 Week
» 26464 Month
» 26464 Year
» 1248029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1249 m/e 12/1912
LNER (1924) 6249   21/02/1925
LNER (1946) 3596   05/01/1947
BR 63596 w/e 30/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/112/1912
O4/726/09/1942
O130/07/1949
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19905
To Service During 12/1912
Withdrawal Thu 29/08/1963 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 50 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 3/12/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 17/11/1922
CLK Colwick 01/11/1927
LNG Langwith Junction 21/11/1927
CLK Colwick 04/01/1937
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 12/03/1944
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
31B March 17/02/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 10/01/1960
   Withdrawn 29/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   29/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1515)
01/12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1443)
22/10/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1940)
22/10/1921 Ross Pop safety valves fitted
04/08/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1954)
15/10/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 818)
08/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1100)
18/11/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1950)
18/01/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
18/01/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1244)
12/03/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1095)
30/03/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1882)
26/09/1942 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3684)
29/07/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3664)
15/10/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 5102)
30/07/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5116)
10/11/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28358)
21/11/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28332)
25/02/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28890)
02/08/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28802)
15/02/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28855)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 14/07/1917 01/12/1917 141 days General
Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1921 22/10/1921 29 days General
Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1923 04/08/1923 43 days General
Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/01/1925 21/02/1925 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6249
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1927 15/10/1927 57 days General
Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1929 28/09/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 18/07/1931 08/08/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1100 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1933 18/11/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1936 18/01/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 1244 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1938 12/03/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 1095 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1940 30/03/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 31/08/1942 26/09/1942 27 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3684 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1944 29/07/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1946 15/10/1946 32 days General
Boiler number 5102 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1947 30/08/1947 22 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 30/04/1949 30/07/1949 92 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5116 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63596
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1951 10/11/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 28358 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1952 15/11/1952 22 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 31/10/1953 21/11/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 28332 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 04/12/1954 15/01/1955 43 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 28/01/1956 25/02/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 28890 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1958 02/08/1958 50 days General
Boiler number 28802 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1958 08/11/1958 1 day Light Casual  
Gorton Works 07/01/1961 15/02/1961 40 days General
Boiler number 28855 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1249
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19905
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
14/07/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1917. Dep: 01/12/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15)
   
24/09/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1921. Dep: 22/10/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
   
17/11/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
23/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1923. Dep: 04/08/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15)
   
03/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1925. Dep: 21/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6249
   
20/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1927. Dep: 15/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15)
   
01/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
17/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1929. Dep: 28/09/1929.    
18/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1931. Dep: 08/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1100 (Diagram 15)
   
28/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
   
11/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1936. Dep: 18/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1244 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
04/01/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
19/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1095 (Diagram 15)
   
16/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15)
   
31/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3684 (Diagram 15D)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
08/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1944. Dep: 29/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D)
   
14/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1946. Dep: 15/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5102 (Diagram 15D)
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
05/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3596    
09/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/08/1947. Dep: 30/08/1947.    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1949. Dep: 30/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5116 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63596
   
20/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28358 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/10/1952. Dep: 15/11/1952.    
31/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28332 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/12/1954. Dep: 15/01/1955.    
28/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1956. Dep: 25/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28890 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1958. Dep: 02/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28802 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/11/1958. Dep: 08/11/1958.    
10/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
07/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1961. Dep: 15/02/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28855 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63596 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev