Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 45 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1970 Week
» 19306 Month
» 297102 Year
» 1181483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1250 m/e 12/1912
LNER (1924) 6250   09/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3597   15/12/1946
BR 63597 w/e 14/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19906
To Service During 12/1912
Withdrawal Thu 18/05/1961 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 48 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 17/11/1922
KEA Keadby 12/08/1931
FRO Frodingham 12/06/1932
DON Doncaster 07/04/1946
MEX Mexborough 17/09/1946
LNG Langwith Junction 05/09/1947
40D Tuxford 09/01/1955
41J Langwith Junction 01/02/1959
   Withdrawn 18/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction 05/10/1947
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   18/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1516)
27/10/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1475)
15/10/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1148)
19/06/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1119)
10/01/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 857)
04/03/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 863)
11/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1305)
17/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1959)
30/12/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 809)
27/06/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 822)
16/12/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3312)
03/05/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 924)
14/05/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3266)
01/09/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22211)
11/07/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22168)
26/11/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22117)
14/06/1958 Water Treatment apparatus fitted
14/06/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22263)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 14/07/1917 27/10/1917 106 days General
Boiler number 1475 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1921 15/10/1921 50 days General
Boiler number 1148 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1923 09/02/1924 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6250
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1926 19/06/1926 85 days General
Boiler number 1119 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1928 15/09/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 13/12/1930 10/01/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1933 04/03/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1935 11/05/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1305 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1937 17/07/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1939 30/12/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1940 19/10/1940 42 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 16/06/1942 27/06/1942 12 days General
Boiler number 822 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1944 16/12/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 3312 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1947 03/05/1947 43 days General
Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/04/1949 14/05/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63597
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1951 01/09/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22211 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1953 11/07/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22168 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1955 26/11/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1957 09/02/1957 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 10/05/1958 14/06/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 22263 (Diagram 15)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1961 13/05/1961 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1250
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19906
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
14/07/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1917. Dep: 27/10/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1475 (Diagram 15)
   
27/08/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1921. Dep: 15/10/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1148 (Diagram 15)
   
17/11/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
17/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1923. Dep: 09/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6250
   
27/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1926. Dep: 19/06/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1119 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1928. Dep: 15/09/1928.    
13/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1930. Dep: 10/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15)
   
12/08/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
12/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
18/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1933. Dep: 04/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15)
   
27/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1935. Dep: 11/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1305 (Diagram 15)
   
10/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 17/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15)
   
16/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1939. Dep: 30/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/09/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940.    
16/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1942. Dep: 27/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 822 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1944. Dep: 16/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3312 (Diagram 15)
   
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
15/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3597    
22/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15)
   
05/09/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
23/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1949. Dep: 14/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63597
   
11/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1951. Dep: 01/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22211 (Diagram 15)
   
27/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22168 (Diagram 15)
   
09/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
29/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1955. Dep: 26/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15)
   
19/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957.    
10/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1958. Dep: 14/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22263 (Diagram 15)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
01/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
13/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/05/1961. Dep: 13/05/1961.    
18/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63597 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev