Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 584 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4132 Week
» 5022 Month
» 313003 Year
» 1197384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1251 m/e 01/1913
LNER (1924) 6251   29/08/1925
War Dept. 782   04/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19907
To Service During 01/1913
Withdrawal Sat 04/10/1941 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 28 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 782 and sent to Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STV Staveley (G.C.) 20/10/1922
ARD Ardsley 13/08/1926
DON Doncaster 01/12/1928
MAR March 02/03/1929
CLK Colwick 11/01/1934
   Withdrawn 04/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1517)
22/12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1458)
29/08/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1027)
08/11/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1096)
18/03/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1852)
06/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1323)
21/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 860)
05/08/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1285)
04/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 938)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 15/09/1917 22/12/1917 99 days General
Boiler number 1458 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1922 16/09/1922 50 days General  
Gorton Works 23/05/1925 29/08/1925 99 days General
Boiler number 1027 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6251
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1928 24/11/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 25/10/1930 08/11/1930 15 days General
Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1933 18/03/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1935 06/07/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1937 21/08/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1939 05/08/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 1285 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1941 04/10/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 938 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 782
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1913 To Service To service as GCR Number 1251
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19907
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/09/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1917. Dep: 22/12/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1458 (Diagram 15)
   
29/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1922. Dep: 16/09/1922.    
20/10/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
23/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1925. Dep: 29/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1027 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6251
   
13/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
13/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1928. Dep: 24/11/1928.    
01/12/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
25/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1930. Dep: 08/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15)
   
04/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1933. Dep: 18/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15)
   
11/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
22/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15)
   
31/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1937. Dep: 21/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1939. Dep: 05/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1285 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 938 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 782
   
04/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 782 from Colwick (CLK)    

prev prev