|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/12/1916 | 28/04/1917 | 134 days | General | Saturated boiler fitted Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1919 | 06/09/1919 | 29 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1921 | 10/12/1921 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1436 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1924 | 29/03/1924 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 455 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6252 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/11/1926 | 31/12/1926 | 56 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1928 | 30/06/1928 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1930 | 30/08/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1933 | 17/06/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1418 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1936 | 23/05/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1939 | 15/04/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1941 | 24/05/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1943 | 11/12/1943 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1946 | 19/10/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3409 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1947 | 29/11/1947 | 22 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1948 | 28/02/1948 | 34 days | Light Repair | After collision Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3599 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1949 | 26/02/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63599 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1951 | 04/08/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22204 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1953 | 15/08/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22211 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1956 | 16/06/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22297 (Diagram 15) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1946 | Crewe - Smoke deflectors | Smoke deflectors are being fitted to all the non-streamlined Princess Coronation locos in the same way as with 6232/52. 6234/3/50 have so far been so treated. | SLS/194605 |
30/03/1946 | W.D. ENGINES IN HOLLAND | The initials N.S. indicates Nederlandsche Spoorwegen, i.e. Netherlands Railways: this being not a State to concern but a limited liability company. Reference to the Netherlands State Railways is thus incorrect. Another point is that all W.D. locos in Holland are on to loan and have not been purchased. They still have their W.D. numbers in addition to their N.S numbers. Six more 0-6-0 saddle tanks are on loan:-N.S. 8822 to 8827, W.D. 75026/53/86, 75104/15/99. The 2-8-0's (W.D. 77125, 77238) which were allotted N.S. 4528/9 were in an accident last August, and were sent to Malines Works in Belgium. After overhaul, they went to to Western Germany, and so never bore their N.S. numbers. Ten more W.D. 2 8 0's went to the N.S. on loan in January, 1946:-N.S. 4528 to 4537, W.D. 77009/10, 77193/4/7, 77011/38, 77188/90, 77358. Of these, 77193/4/7 came from the Dutch State Mines in Limburg. At the same time N.S. 4511 (W.D. 79196) went to the State Mines (S.M.), while N.S. 4504/9 (W.D. 78677 and 79189) left for Belgium. These three locos. are no longer on the N.S. list. W.D. 77193 was S.M. 62. Also noted S.M. 74 (W.D. 75002). Sixty 2-10-0's are on loan to the N.S. from January, 1946:-N.S. 5001 to 5060: W.D. 73650/61/2/4-71/3/5/6/9-81/9-93/5-9, 73700/1/4-7/9/11-3/5/7-22/7/9/32-4/6-41/4/5/7-9. |
SLS/194605 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1252 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19908 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
16/12/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1916. Dep: 28/04/1917. Work undertaken: Saturated boiler fitted Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15Sat) |
||
09/08/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1919. Dep: 06/09/1919. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/09/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1921. Dep: 10/12/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1436 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/11/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
02/02/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
09/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 29/03/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 455 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6252 |
||
06/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1926. Dep: 31/12/1926. | ||
05/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1928. Dep: 30/06/1928. | ||
02/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 30/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1933. Dep: 17/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1418 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1936. Dep: 23/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
01/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1939. Dep: 15/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1943. Dep: 11/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
28/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3409 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3599 | ||
08/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/11/1947. Dep: 29/11/1947. | ||
26/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/01/1948. Dep: 28/02/1948. Work undertaken: After collision Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3599 |
||
11/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
17/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1949. Dep: 26/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63599 |
||
08/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
14/01/1950 | Allocation | |||
23/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
21/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1951. Dep: 04/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22204 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1953. Dep: 15/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22211 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
18/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
19/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1956. Dep: 16/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22297 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/02/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63599 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |