Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 108 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2969 Week
» 20305 Month
» 298101 Year
» 1182482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 375 m/e 04/1913
LNER (1924) 5375   23/01/1926
War Dept. 768   11/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 413
To Service During 04/1913
Withdrawal Sat 11/10/1941 off Annesley (ANN)
Service Life 28 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 768 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 24/07/1915
   Withdrawn 11/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1535)
09/03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1515)
02/06/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1692)
23/01/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1096)
30/08/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 949)
28/01/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1296)
01/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1405)
04/09/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1323)
18/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3292)
11/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3359)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/09/1917 09/03/1918 169 days General
Boiler number 1515 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1920 30/10/1920 57 days General  
Gorton Works 17/03/1923 02/06/1923 78 days General
Boiler number 1692 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1925 23/01/1926 50 days General
Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5375
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1928 09/06/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 02/08/1930 30/08/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1933 28/01/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1296 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1935 01/06/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1937 04/09/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1939 18/11/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3292 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1941 11/10/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 3359 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 768
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1913 To Service To service as GCR Number 375
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
24/07/1915 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
22/09/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1917. Dep: 09/03/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1515 (Diagram 15)
   
04/09/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1920. Dep: 30/10/1920.    
17/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1923. Dep: 02/06/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1692 (Diagram 15)
   
05/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1925. Dep: 23/01/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5375
   
28/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1928. Dep: 09/06/1928.    
02/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 30/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
   
14/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1933. Dep: 28/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1296 (Diagram 15)
   
18/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1935. Dep: 01/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 15)
   
14/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1937. Dep: 04/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15)
   
04/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3292 (Diagram 15)
   
29/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3359 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 768
   
11/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 768 from Annesley (ANN)    

prev prev