|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/09/1920 | 05/02/1921 | 155 days | General | Boiler number 1449 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1923 | 15/09/1923 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1924 | 13/12/1924 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5377 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1927 | 21/05/1927 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1929 | 03/08/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1931 | 30/05/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1884 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1934 | 17/02/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1101 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1936 | 20/06/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1938 | 08/10/1938 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3345 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1941 | 08/02/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1943 | 10/07/1943 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1945 | 15/12/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1947 | 31/12/1947 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 801 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1950 | 08/04/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63602 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1952 | 31/05/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22143 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1955 | 05/03/1955 | 57 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28311 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1957 | 30/11/1957 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28941 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1960 | 02/04/1960 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28931 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1960 | 23/04/1960 | 12 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 377 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
04/09/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1920. Dep: 05/02/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1449 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/11/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1923. Dep: 15/09/1923. | ||
06/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
01/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1924. Dep: 13/12/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5377 |
||
12/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1927. Dep: 21/05/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/12/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
22/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1929. Dep: 03/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1931. Dep: 30/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1884 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 17/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1101 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
06/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
03/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1938. Dep: 08/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3345 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1943. Dep: 10/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3602 | ||
06/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1947. Dep: 31/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 801 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1950. Dep: 08/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63602 |
||
18/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
17/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1952. Dep: 31/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22143 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1955. Dep: 05/03/1955. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28311 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
11/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
09/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28941 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
05/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1960. Dep: 02/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28931 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1960. Dep: 23/04/1960. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63602 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |