Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 856 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4404 Week
» 5294 Month
» 313275 Year
» 1197656 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 377 m/e 05/1913
LNER (1924) 5377   13/12/1924
LNER (1946) 3602   27/10/1946
BR 63602 w/e 08/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/205/1913
O4/805/03/1955
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 413
To Service During 05/1913
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 49 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 3/9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 18/11/1921
KEA Keadby 06/01/1924
LIN Lincoln 04/12/1927
FRO Frodingham 17/02/1934
38A Colwick 18/03/1951
38B Annesley 22/01/1956
38A Colwick 11/11/1956
36C Frodingham 21/06/1959
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 31/01/1960
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 38A Colwick 3w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1537)
05/02/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1449)
21/05/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1154)
03/08/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1883)
30/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1884)
17/02/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1101)
20/06/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1399)
20/06/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
08/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3345)
08/02/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3360)
10/07/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1062)
15/12/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1134)
31/12/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 801)
08/04/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3401)
31/05/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22143)
05/03/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28311)
30/11/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28941)
02/04/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28931)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 04/09/1920 05/02/1921 155 days General
Boiler number 1449 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1923 15/09/1923 78 days General  
Gorton Works 01/11/1924 13/12/1924 43 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5377
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1927 21/05/1927 71 days General
Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1929 03/08/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1931 30/05/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1884 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1934 17/02/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1101 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1936 20/06/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1938 08/10/1938 36 days General
Boiler number 3345 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1941 08/02/1941 22 days General
Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1943 10/07/1943 8 days General
Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1945 15/12/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1947 31/12/1947 26 days General
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1950 08/04/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63602
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1952 31/05/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 22143 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1955 05/03/1955 57 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28311 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1957 30/11/1957 22 days General
Boiler number 28941 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1960 02/04/1960 29 days General
Boiler number 28931 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1960 23/04/1960 12 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1913 To Service To service as GCR Number 377
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
04/09/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1920. Dep: 05/02/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1449 (Diagram 15)
   
18/11/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1923. Dep: 15/09/1923.    
06/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
01/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1924. Dep: 13/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5377
   
12/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1927. Dep: 21/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15)
   
04/12/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
22/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1929. Dep: 03/08/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
   
09/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1931. Dep: 30/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1884 (Diagram 15)
   
03/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 17/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1101 (Diagram 15)
   
17/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
06/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
03/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1938. Dep: 08/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3345 (Diagram 15)
   
18/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 15)
   
03/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1943. Dep: 10/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3602    
06/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1947. Dep: 31/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 15)
   
18/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1950. Dep: 08/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63602
   
18/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
17/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1952. Dep: 31/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22143 (Diagram 15)
   
08/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1955. Dep: 05/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28311 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
11/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
09/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28941 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
05/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1960. Dep: 02/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28931 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1960. Dep: 23/04/1960.    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63602 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev