Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 772 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 772 Week
» 18108 Month
» 295904 Year
» 1180285 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 378 m/e 05/1913
LNER (1924) 5378   17/07/1926
LNER (1946) 3603   12/01/1947
BR 63603 w/e 13/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/105/1913
O4/720/07/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 413
To Service During 05/1913
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/07/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 49 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 17/08/1921
IMM Immingham 09/02/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 01/01/1926
YK York (North) 19/09/1940
HTN Heaton 28/03/1943
TDK Tyne Dock 23/07/1945
HTN Heaton 22/07/1946
TDK Tyne Dock 08/09/1946
HLD Hull Dairycoates 06/02/1949
40E Langwith Junction 02/09/1951
39A Gorton 26/09/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 21/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
LOAN 40B Immingham 02/09/1951
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 03/10/1953
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 21/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1538)
16/07/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1479)
12/01/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1536)
17/07/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1808)
09/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 933)
22/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 871)
21/09/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1273)
13/11/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1239)
20/07/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3675)
20/02/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3665)
23/02/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3692)
13/11/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3680)
10/11/1951 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22324)
19/12/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22323)
07/07/1956 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22315)
15/08/1959 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22338)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/05/1921 16/07/1921 50 days General
Boiler number 1479 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1923 12/01/1924 57 days General
Boiler number 1536 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/04/1926 17/07/1926 99 days General
Boiler number 1808 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5378
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1928 02/02/1929 57 days General  
Gorton Works 25/04/1931 09/05/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1933 22/07/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 871 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1935 21/09/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1937 13/11/1937 15 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1940 20/07/1940 15 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3675 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1943 20/02/1943 18 days General
Boiler number 3665 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1945 03/03/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 09/02/1946 23/02/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3692 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1948 13/11/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3680 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63603
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1951 10/11/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22324 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1953 19/12/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22323 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1956 07/07/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22315 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1959 15/08/1959 36 days General
Boiler number 22338 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1962 20/07/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1913 To Service To service as GCR Number 378
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
28/05/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1921. Dep: 16/07/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1479 (Diagram 15)
   
17/08/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1923. Dep: 12/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1536 (Diagram 15)
   
09/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
01/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
10/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1926. Dep: 17/07/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1808 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5378
   
08/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1928. Dep: 02/02/1929.    
25/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 09/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 871 (Diagram 15)
   
31/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1935. Dep: 21/09/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 15)
   
30/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1937. Dep: 13/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15)
   
06/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3675 (Diagram 15D)
   
19/09/1940 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
03/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3665 (Diagram 15D)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
24/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945.    
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
09/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3692 (Diagram 15D)
   
22/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
08/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
12/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3603    
23/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1948. Dep: 13/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3680 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63603
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
27/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22324 (Diagram 15D)
   
26/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
28/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22323 (Diagram 15D)
   
09/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1956. Dep: 07/07/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22315 (Diagram 15D)
   
11/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1959. Dep: 15/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22338 (Diagram 15D)
   
20/07/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/07/1962. Dep: 20/07/1962.    
21/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63603 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev