Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 267 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2606 Week
» 8740 Month
» 236624 Year
» 1458189 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 380 m/e 06/1913
LNER (1924) 5380   05/12/1925
LNER (1946) 3605   22/12/1946
BR 63605 w/e 10/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 413
To Service During 06/1913
Withdrawal Wed 08/08/1962 off Ardsley (56B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 49 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 12/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1913
ANN Annesley 23/11/1917
CLK Colwick 05/04/1924
ANN Annesley 14/10/1927
CLK Colwick 29/06/1947
SHF Sheffield Darnall 09/05/1948
37A Ardsley 20/12/1953
   Withdrawn 08/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 26/12/1953
WDN   08/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1540)
22/09/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1506)
01/12/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1757)
05/12/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1076)
30/01/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1262)
26/05/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1218)
11/04/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 515)
11/04/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
09/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3226)
06/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1473)
24/12/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3389)
16/09/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 805)
30/03/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3390)
10/04/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3412)
04/11/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22125)
28/02/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22894)
18/02/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22152)
22/08/1959 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22893)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803
30/04/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. SLS/194806

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/07/1917 22/09/1917 78 days General
Boiler number 1506 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1920 23/10/1920 78 days General  
Gorton Works 13/10/1923 01/12/1923 50 days General
Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1925 05/12/1925 57 days General
Boiler number 1076 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5380
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1929 03/08/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 23/01/1932 30/01/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1934 26/05/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1936 11/04/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1938 09/07/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1940 06/07/1940 8 days General
Boiler number C1473 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 16/11/1942 24/12/1942 39 days General
Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1944 16/09/1944 12 days General
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1946 30/03/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1948 10/04/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3412 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63605
 
Gorton Works 06/09/1949 24/09/1949 19 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 21/10/1950 04/11/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 22125 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1953 28/02/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22894 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1956 18/02/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22152 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1959 22/08/1959 43 days General
Boiler number 22893 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1913 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 380
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
07/07/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1917. Dep: 22/09/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1506 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
07/08/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1920. Dep: 23/10/1920.    
13/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1923. Dep: 01/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15)
   
05/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
10/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1925. Dep: 05/12/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1076 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5380
   
14/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
06/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1929. Dep: 03/08/1929.    
23/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1932. Dep: 30/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 15)
   
05/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1934. Dep: 26/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15)
   
28/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1936. Dep: 11/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
02/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15)
   
29/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1473 (Diagram 15)
   
16/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1942. Dep: 24/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15)
   
05/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1944. Dep: 16/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
   
09/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3605    
29/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
13/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1948. Dep: 10/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3412 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63605
   
09/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
06/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/09/1949. Dep: 24/09/1949.    
21/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1950. Dep: 04/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22125 (Diagram 15)
   
14/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22894 (Diagram 15)
   
20/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
21/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1956. Dep: 18/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22152 (Diagram 15)
   
11/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1959. Dep: 22/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22893 (Diagram 15)
   
08/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63605 from Ardsley (56B)    

prev prev