Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 135 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2120 Week
» 9304 Month
» 317285 Year
» 1201666 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 381 m/e 07/1913
LNER (1924) 5381   13/08/1925
LNER (1946) 3606   13/12/1946
BR 63606 w/e 10/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/107/1913
O4/802/07/1955
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 413
To Service During 07/1913
Withdrawal Sun 13/06/1965 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 51 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 7/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 08/08/1916
ANN Annesley 11/03/1924
CLK Colwick 05/04/1924
ANN Annesley 06/09/1927
WFD Woodford Halse 11/08/1944
FRO Frodingham 28/04/1946
   Withdrawn 13/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/07/0481 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 856)
07/1913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1541)
22/05/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1446)
14/02/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1458)
14/04/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1161)
02/09/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1886)
25/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1368)
02/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1405)
13/12/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1245)
11/03/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1025)
27/04/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3203)
28/10/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22121)
02/07/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28274)
01/02/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28311)
25/03/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28340)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 27/03/1920 22/05/1920 57 days General
Boiler number 1446 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1922 01/11/1922 89 days General  
Gorton Works 13/06/1925 13/08/1925 62 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5381
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1928 14/02/1929 98 days General
Boiler number 1458 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1931 14/04/1931 69 days General
Boiler number 1161 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1933 02/09/1933 45 days General
Boiler number 1886 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1935 25/10/1935 46 days General
Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/09/1937 02/10/1937 26 days General
Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1937 12/10/1937 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 19/10/1939 09/12/1939 52 days General  
Gorton Works 26/10/1941 13/12/1941 49 days General
Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1944 11/03/1944 19 days General
Boiler number 1025 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1946 27/04/1946 97 days General
Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1948 06/07/1948 31 days General
Renumbered to BR 63606
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1950 28/10/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 22121 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1950 17/11/1950 12 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 26/09/1952 18/10/1952 23 days General  
Gorton Works 07/03/1955 02/07/1955 118 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28274 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1957 01/02/1958 33 days General
Boiler number 28311 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1961 25/03/1961 30 days General
Boiler number 28340 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1962 14/02/1962 17 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/07/0481 Modification Diagram 15 number 856 boiler fitted    
07/1913 To Service To service as GCR Number 381
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
08/08/1916 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
27/03/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1920. Dep: 22/05/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1446 (Diagram 15)
   
05/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1922. Dep: 01/11/1922.    
11/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
05/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
13/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1925. Dep: 13/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5381
   
06/09/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
09/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1928. Dep: 14/02/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1458 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1931. Dep: 14/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1161 (Diagram 15)
   
20/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1886 (Diagram 15)
   
10/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1935. Dep: 25/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 15)
   
07/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 15)
   
08/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/10/1937. Dep: 12/10/1937.    
19/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939.    
26/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1941. Dep: 13/12/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15)
   
22/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1025 (Diagram 15)
   
11/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
21/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1946. Dep: 27/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15)
   
28/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
13/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3606    
06/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1948. Dep: 06/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63606
   
03/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1950. Dep: 28/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22121 (Diagram 15)
   
06/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1950. Dep: 17/11/1950.    
26/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952.    
07/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28274 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1957. Dep: 01/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28311 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1961. Dep: 25/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28340 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1962. Dep: 14/02/1962.    
13/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63606 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev