Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 206 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 6918 Week
» 20022 Month
» 20022 Year
» 1241587 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 382 m/e 07/1913
LNER (1924) 5382   14/11/1925
War Dept. 713   10/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 413
To Service During 07/1913
Withdrawal Wed 10/09/1941 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 28 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 713 and sent to the Middle East via Glasgow 16/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 02/03/1916
ANN Annesley 13/03/1924
CLK Colwick 05/04/1924
   Withdrawn 10/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1542)
25/09/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1869)
23/02/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1359)
17/10/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 547)
17/03/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1018)
31/10/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
31/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3265)
15/04/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3365)
21/06/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3358)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/08/1920 25/09/1920 50 days General
Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1923 17/03/1923 64 days General  
Gorton Works 05/09/1925 14/11/1925 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5382
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1926 20/03/1926 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 17/11/1928 23/02/1929 99 days General
Boiler number 1359 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1931 17/10/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1934 17/03/1934 15 days General
Altered spring gear for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 1018 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/10/1936 31/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1939 15/04/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 3365 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1941 21/06/1941 20 days General
Boiler number 3358 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1913 To Service To service as GCR Number 382
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/03/1916 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
07/08/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1920. Dep: 25/09/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15)
   
13/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1923. Dep: 17/03/1923.    
13/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
05/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
05/09/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5382
   
13/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1926. Dep: 20/03/1926.    
17/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1928. Dep: 23/02/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1359 (Diagram 15)
   
26/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1931. Dep: 17/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15)
   
03/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Altered spring gear for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 1018 (Diagram 15)
   
17/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
25/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 15/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3365 (Diagram 15)
   
02/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1941. Dep: 21/06/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3358 (Diagram 15)
   
10/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 713 from Colwick (CLK)    
10/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 713    

prev prev