|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 30/09/1922 | 09/12/1922 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1498 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1925 | 08/08/1925 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5383 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1927 | 30/06/1927 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1928 | 29/09/1928 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1931 | 04/07/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1086 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1934 | 13/01/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1936 | 15/08/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1938 | 17/12/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1941 | 24/05/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 383 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
13/11/1920 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
30/09/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1922. Dep: 09/12/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1498 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
31/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
06/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1925. Dep: 08/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5383 |
||
25/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 30/06/1927. | ||
07/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1928. Dep: 29/09/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 04/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1086 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1934. Dep: 13/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1936. Dep: 15/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
03/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1938. Dep: 17/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 711 from Colwick (CLK) | ||
10/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 711 |