Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 384 m/e 09/1913
LNER (1924) 5384   20/02/1926
LNER (1946) 3609   25/08/1946
BR 63609 w/e 21/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 413
To Service During 09/1913
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 49 yrs , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 24/07/1919
LNG Langwith Junction 28/04/1931
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
STV Staveley (G.C.) 09/11/1947
SHF Sheffield Darnall 06/02/1949
   Withdrawn 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 12/02/1949
WDN   23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1544)
27/08/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1437)
30/09/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1006)
03/11/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1358)
11/04/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1413)
09/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3220)
16/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3232)
20/04/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3308)
10/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 933)
25/11/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3321)
19/10/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3204)
03/01/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3400)
21/05/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3327)
29/03/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22253)
12/04/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22195)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 30/07/1921 27/08/1921 29 days General
Boiler number 1437 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1923 03/11/1923 71 days General
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1925 20/02/1926 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5384
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1928 03/11/1928 85 days General
Boiler number 1358 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/03/1931 11/04/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1933 30/09/1933 8 days General  
Gorton Works 02/11/1935 09/11/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1937 16/10/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1940 20/04/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3308 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 19/08/1942 10/10/1942 53 days General
Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1944 10/06/1944 12 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 11/11/1944 25/11/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1946 19/10/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3204 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1947 18/10/1947 8 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 31/12/1947 03/01/1948 4 days Heavy
Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/04/1949 21/05/1949 29 days General
Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63609
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1952 29/03/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22253 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1954 25/12/1954 36 days General  
Gorton Works 08/03/1958 12/04/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 22195 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1913 To Service To service as GCR Number 384
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
24/07/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
30/07/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1921. Dep: 27/08/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1437 (Diagram 15)
   
25/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1923. Dep: 03/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
   
19/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1925. Dep: 20/02/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5384
   
11/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1928. Dep: 03/11/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1358 (Diagram 15)
   
21/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1931. Dep: 11/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15)
   
28/04/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
23/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1933. Dep: 30/09/1933.    
02/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1935. Dep: 09/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 15)
   
02/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1937. Dep: 16/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 15)
   
06/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3308 (Diagram 15)
   
19/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15)
   
30/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944.    
11/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 15)
   
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3609    
05/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3204 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
11/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/10/1947. Dep: 18/10/1947.    
09/11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
31/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 03/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15)
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
23/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1949. Dep: 21/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63609
   
08/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1952. Dep: 29/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22253 (Diagram 15)
   
20/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1954. Dep: 25/12/1954.    
08/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1958. Dep: 12/04/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22195 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63609 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev