Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 50 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7504 Week
» 10086 Month
» 274719 Year
» 1496284 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 387 m/e 01/1914
LNER (1924) 5387   26/11/1925
LNER (1946) 3612   08/10/1946
BR 63612 w/e 01/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/101/1914
O4/809/07/1955
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 01/1914
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/11/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 51 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 12/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1914
ANN Annesley on 07/09/1917
CLK Colwick on 05/04/1924
DON Doncaster on 23/01/1944
MEX Mexborough on 12/03/1944
36D Barnsley on 25/11/1956
41J Langwith Junction on 29/11/1959
41F Mexborough on 01/05/1960
41H Staveley (G.C.) on 02/10/1960
41J Langwith Junction on 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 14/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN STR Stratford on 15/08/1949
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   on 06/03/1959
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 14/05/1960
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   w/e 12/10/1964
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 14/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 952)
08/03/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1518)
26/11/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1072)
25/06/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1167)
21/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1054)
14/03/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
14/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1029)
23/09/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1039)
12/10/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3338)
05/12/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3334)
03/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3336)
11/09/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1190)
01/04/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3243)
20/12/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22887)
09/07/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28459)
26/04/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28332)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/03/1962 Gorton Works (Outside Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. SLS/196204
05/09/1965 Locomotives Stored at Barry (In sidings at Barry Docks) In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 4156, 5526, 6024, 34067, 44123, 2873, 4157, 5532, 7229, 34070, 44422, 3612, 4160, 5538, 7903, 34072, 45699, 3814, 4253, 5539, 9629, 34073, 3845, 4270, 5541, 34081, 80067, 3862, 4561, 5542, 30541, 34092, 92207, 4110, 4566, 5552, 30830, 34105, 92245, 4115, 4588, 5553, 34016, 35006, 4121, 5193, 5572, 34027, 35009, 4144, 5227, 5952, 34028, 35018, 4150, 5521, 6023, 34058, 35025; Behind Barry Works: 2807, 4930, 5199, 6619, 30499, 45690, 2857, 4936, 5224, 6634, 30506, 48431, 2861, 4942, 5239, 6686, 30825, 53808, 2874, 4953, 5322, 6695, 30828, 53809, 2885, 4979, 5619, 6960, 30841, 31625, 3803, 4983, 5637, 6989, 30847, 31638, 3822, 5029, 5643, 7027, 31618, 4141, 5043, 5668, 7200, 31806, 4247, 5051, 5900, 7202, 31874, 4248, 5080, 5967, 7325, 4277, 5164, 5972, 9466. SLS/196510

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/11/1922 08/03/1923 118 days General
Boiler number 1518 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1925 26/11/1925 56 days General
Boiler number 1072 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5387
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1928 29/11/1928 64 days General  
Gorton Works 23/04/1931 25/06/1931 64 days General
Boiler number 1167 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1933 21/10/1933 44 days General
Boiler number 1054 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1936 14/03/1936 30 days General
Boiler number 1029 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1938 23/09/1938 68 days General
Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1940 12/10/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1942 05/12/1942 22 days General
Boiler number 3334 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1945 03/03/1945 42 days General
Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1947 11/09/1947 56 days General
Boiler number 1190 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1950 01/04/1950 29 days General
Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63612
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1950 12/04/1950 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 27/11/1952 20/12/1952 24 days General
Boiler number 22887 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1955 09/07/1955 77 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28459 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1959 02/03/1959 28 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 17/01/1961 16/02/1961 31 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 15/03/1962 26/04/1962 43 days General
Boiler number 28332 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 387
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
07/09/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
11/11/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1922. Dep: 08/03/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1518 (Diagram 15)
   
05/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
02/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1925. Dep: 26/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1072 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5387
   
27/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1928. Dep: 29/11/1928.    
23/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1931. Dep: 25/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1167 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1933. Dep: 21/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1054 (Diagram 15)
   
14/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1029 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
18/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1938. Dep: 23/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15)
   
21/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15)
   
14/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3334 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
21/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15)
   
08/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3612    
18/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1947. Dep: 11/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1190 (Diagram 15)
   
04/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1950. Dep: 01/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63612
   
05/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1950. Dep: 12/04/1950.    
27/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1952. Dep: 20/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22887 (Diagram 15)
   
24/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1955. Dep: 09/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28459 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
03/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 03/02/1959. Dep: 02/03/1959.    
29/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
01/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
02/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
17/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/01/1961. Dep: 16/02/1961.    
15/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1962. Dep: 26/04/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28332 (Diagram 100A)
   
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
14/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63612 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev