Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 103 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5324 Week
» 20438 Month
» 323628 Year
» 1545193 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 388 m/e 02/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5388   16/02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3613   14/04/1946
British Railways 63613 w/e 09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/102/1914
O4/819/08/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 02/1914
Withdrawal Sun 25/07/1965 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 51 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 9/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1914
MEX Mexborough on 11/05/1917
CLK Colwick on 28/01/1945
ANN Annesley on 30/03/1947
CLK Colwick on 29/06/1947
STV Staveley (G.C.) on 09/11/1947
38A Colwick on 27/06/1954
36A Doncaster on 29/01/1956
36C Frodingham on 16/09/1962
36A Doncaster on 14/10/1962
   Withdrawn on 25/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 05/04/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 29/06/1947
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 25/10/1962
WDN   on 06/05/1964
WDN   w/e 25/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 964)
08/08/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1687)
16/02/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1472)
22/01/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 933)
30/04/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1888)
10/02/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1887)
05/09/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1954)
24/06/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3278)
16/05/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 854)
19/08/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5021)
09/10/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5025)
16/06/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28326)
14/02/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28811)
05/02/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28355)
29/03/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28806)
24/11/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28849)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 13/05/1922 08/08/1922 88 days General
Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1923 16/02/1924 71 days General
Boiler number 1472 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5388
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1926 18/06/1926 85 days General  
Gorton Works 27/10/1928 22/01/1929 88 days General
Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1931 30/04/1931 69 days General
Boiler number 1888 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1934 10/02/1934 34 days General
Boiler number 1887 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1936 05/09/1936 16 days General
Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1939 24/06/1939 49 days General
Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/04/1942 16/05/1942 37 days General
Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1944 19/08/1944 51 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5021 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1946 27/07/1946 56 days General  
Gorton Works 30/08/1948 09/10/1948 41 days General
Boiler number 5025 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63613
 
Gorton Works 10/05/1951 16/06/1951 38 days General
Boiler number 28326 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1953 14/02/1953 22 days Heavy
Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1954 05/02/1954 23 days General
Boiler number 28355 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1956 29/03/1956 45 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1957 06/07/1957 31 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 18/10/1960 24/11/1960 38 days General
Boiler number 28849 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1960 12/12/1960 11 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 21/06/1962 04/07/1962 14 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 388
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
11/05/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
13/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1922. Dep: 08/08/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15)
   
08/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1923. Dep: 16/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1472 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5388
   
26/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1926. Dep: 18/06/1926.    
27/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1928. Dep: 22/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15)
   
21/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 30/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1888 (Diagram 15)
   
08/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1934. Dep: 10/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1887 (Diagram 15)
   
21/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1936. Dep: 05/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15)
   
07/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1939. Dep: 24/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15)
   
10/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1942. Dep: 16/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15)
   
30/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5021 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
14/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3613    
02/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946.    
30/03/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
29/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
30/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1948. Dep: 09/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5025 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63613
   
10/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1951. Dep: 16/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28326 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/01/1953. Dep: 14/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1954. Dep: 05/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28355 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
14/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1956. Dep: 29/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/06/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957.    
18/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1960. Dep: 24/11/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28849 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/12/1960. Dep: 12/12/1960.    
21/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1962. Dep: 04/07/1962.    
16/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
14/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
25/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63613 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev