|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/05/1922 | 08/08/1922 | 88 days | General | Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1923 | 16/02/1924 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1472 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5388 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1926 | 18/06/1926 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1928 | 22/01/1929 | 88 days | General | Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1931 | 30/04/1931 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 1888 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1934 | 10/02/1934 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 1887 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1936 | 05/09/1936 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1939 | 24/06/1939 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/04/1942 | 16/05/1942 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1944 | 19/08/1944 | 51 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5021 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1946 | 27/07/1946 | 56 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1948 | 09/10/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 5025 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63613 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1951 | 16/06/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28326 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1953 | 14/02/1953 | 22 days | Heavy | Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1954 | 05/02/1954 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28355 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1956 | 29/03/1956 | 45 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1957 | 06/07/1957 | 31 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1960 | 24/11/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28849 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1960 | 12/12/1960 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1962 | 04/07/1962 | 14 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/1960 | Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 388 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
11/05/1917 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
13/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1922. Dep: 08/08/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1923. Dep: 16/02/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1472 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5388 |
||
26/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1926. Dep: 18/06/1926. | ||
27/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1928. Dep: 22/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 30/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1888 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1934. Dep: 10/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1887 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1936. Dep: 05/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1939. Dep: 24/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1942. Dep: 16/05/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5021 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
14/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3613 | ||
02/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946. | ||
30/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
29/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
30/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1948. Dep: 09/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5025 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63613 |
||
10/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1951. Dep: 16/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28326 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/01/1953. Dep: 14/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1954. Dep: 05/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28355 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
29/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
14/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1956. Dep: 29/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/06/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957. | ||
18/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1960. Dep: 24/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28849 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/12/1960. Dep: 12/12/1960. | ||
21/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1962. Dep: 04/07/1962. | ||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
14/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
25/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63613 from Doncaster (36A) |