|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/08/1922 | 18/11/1922 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 1462 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1925 | 28/02/1925 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1339 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5389 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1928 | 17/03/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/01/1930 | 25/01/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/07/1932 | 16/07/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1934 | 01/09/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1936 | 13/06/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1938 | 30/07/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1940 | 06/07/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1942 | 21/01/1943 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 26/02/1943 | 27/03/1943 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1945 | 03/02/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3417 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1946 | 30/03/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3614 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1947 | 25/01/1947 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1948 | 30/10/1948 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63614 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1949 | 05/02/1949 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1950 | 23/12/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22141 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1953 | 24/01/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22893 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1955 | 05/11/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22106 (Diagram 15) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/10/1958 | Colwich MPD - stored locomotives | 63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). | SLS/195811 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 389 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
07/09/1918 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
05/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1922. Dep: 18/11/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1462 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1925. Dep: 28/02/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1339 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5389 |
||
04/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1928. Dep: 17/03/1928. | ||
04/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1930. Dep: 25/01/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 16/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1934. Dep: 01/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
16/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1938. Dep: 30/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1942. Dep: 21/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/02/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943. | ||
06/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 03/02/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3417 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3614 |
||
11/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 25/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
23/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/10/1948. Dep: 30/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63614 |
||
29/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1949. Dep: 05/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
02/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1950. Dep: 23/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22141 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1953. Dep: 24/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22893 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
08/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1955. Dep: 05/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22106 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/04/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63614 from Colwick (40E) |