Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 272 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4909 Week
» 16202 Month
» 280835 Year
» 1502400 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 389 m/e 02/1914
LNER (1924) 5389   28/02/1925
LNER (1946) 3614   30/03/1946
BR 63614 w/e 30/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 02/1914
Withdrawal Tue 28/04/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 45 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 2/5/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1914
ANN Annesley on 07/09/1918
CLK Colwick on 29/06/1947
ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
39A Gorton on 26/11/1950
38A Colwick on 13/06/1954
   Withdrawn on 28/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 29/06/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   on 28/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1039)
18/11/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1462)
28/02/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1339)
25/01/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1485)
16/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1207)
01/09/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 943)
13/06/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3245)
13/06/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
30/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1081)
06/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3403)
21/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3207)
03/02/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3417)
25/01/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3261)
05/02/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3259)
23/12/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22141)
24/01/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22893)
05/11/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22106)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/10/1958 Colwich MPD - stored locomotives 63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). SLS/195811

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/08/1922 18/11/1922 106 days General
Boiler number 1462 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1925 28/02/1925 36 days General
Boiler number 1339 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5389
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1928 17/03/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 04/01/1930 25/01/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1932 16/07/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1934 01/09/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1936 13/06/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 16/07/1938 30/07/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1940 06/07/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1942 21/01/1943 52 days General
Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 26/02/1943 27/03/1943 30 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 06/01/1945 03/02/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 3417 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1946 30/03/1946 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3614
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1947 25/01/1947 15 days General
Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1948 30/10/1948 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63614
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1949 05/02/1949 8 days General
Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1950 23/12/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 22141 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/01/1953 24/01/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22893 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1955 05/11/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22106 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 389
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
07/09/1918 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
05/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1922. Dep: 18/11/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1462 (Diagram 15)
   
24/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1925. Dep: 28/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1339 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5389
   
04/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1928. Dep: 17/03/1928.    
04/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1930. Dep: 25/01/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15)
   
09/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 16/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1934. Dep: 01/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
   
23/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
16/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1938. Dep: 30/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15)
   
29/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15)
   
01/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1942. Dep: 21/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15)
   
26/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/02/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943.    
06/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 03/02/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3417 (Diagram 15)
   
16/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3614
   
11/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 25/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15)
   
29/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
23/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/10/1948. Dep: 30/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63614
   
29/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1949. Dep: 05/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15)
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
02/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1950. Dep: 23/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22141 (Diagram 15)
   
03/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1953. Dep: 24/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22893 (Diagram 15)
   
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1955. Dep: 05/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22106 (Diagram 15)
   
28/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63614 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev