Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 81 Today
» 1187 Yesterday
» 2395 Week
» 13688 Month
» 278321 Year
» 1499886 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 390 m/e 02/1914
LNER (1924) 5390   08/06/1926
LNER (1946) 3615   21/10/1946
BR 63615 w/e 23/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/102/1914
O4/709/12/1939
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 02/1914
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 50 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 11/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1914
MEX Mexborough on 20/09/1919
LNG Langwith Junction on 05/10/1947
40B Immingham on 24/07/1955
40E Colwick on 23/09/1962
41J Langwith Junction on 22/09/1963
   Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction on 05/10/1947
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 6w/e 05/10/1963
WDN   on 07/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1054)
01/10/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1501)
08/06/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1745)
25/09/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1206)
19/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1224)
19/07/1934 Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles
31/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3272)
09/12/1939 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3657)
14/11/1942 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3661)
05/05/1945 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3657)
28/04/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3672)
05/11/1949 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3668)
12/01/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22327)
29/04/1954 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22320)
28/09/1957 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22337)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/07/1921 01/10/1921 71 days General
Boiler number 1501 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1923 24/10/1923 82 days General  
Gorton Works 31/03/1926 08/06/1926 70 days General
Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5390
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1928 17/07/1928 49 days General  
Gorton Works 02/08/1930 25/09/1930 55 days General
Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1934 19/07/1934 30 days General
Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15)
Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1936 31/12/1936 42 days General
Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1939 09/12/1939 37 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1942 14/11/1942 73 days General
Boiler number 3661 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1945 05/05/1945 56 days General
Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1947 28/04/1947 94 days General
Boiler number 3672 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1948 21/10/1948 11 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63615
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1949 05/11/1949 42 days General
Boiler number 3668 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1949 12/11/1949 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 13/12/1951 12/01/1952 31 days General
Boiler number 22327 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1954 29/04/1954 32 days General
Boiler number 22320 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1956 01/09/1956 66 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 24/08/1957 28/09/1957 36 days General
Boiler number 22337 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1960 14/01/1961 48 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 25/02/1961 11/03/1961 15 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 390
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
20/09/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
23/07/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1921. Dep: 01/10/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1501 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1923. Dep: 24/10/1923.    
31/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1926. Dep: 08/06/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5390
   
30/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1928. Dep: 17/07/1928.    
02/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 25/09/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15)
   
20/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1934. Dep: 19/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15)
Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles
   
20/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15)
   
03/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D)
   
03/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3661 (Diagram 15D)
   
11/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1945. Dep: 05/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D)
   
21/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3615    
25/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 28/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3672 (Diagram 15D)
   
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
11/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/10/1948. Dep: 21/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63615
   
25/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1949. Dep: 05/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3668 (Diagram 15D)
   
09/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949.    
13/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1951. Dep: 12/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22327 (Diagram 15D)
   
29/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1954. Dep: 29/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22320 (Diagram 15D)
   
24/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
28/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/06/1956. Dep: 01/09/1956.    
24/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1957. Dep: 28/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22337 (Diagram 15D)
   
28/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/11/1960. Dep: 14/01/1961.    
25/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1961. Dep: 11/03/1961.    
23/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
22/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63615 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev